Global Patent Index - EP 3119487 A4

EP 3119487 A4 2017-10-18 - METHOD OF GENERATING AN INPUT IN AN OMNIDIRECTIONAL LOCOMOTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD OF GENERATING AN INPUT IN AN OMNIDIRECTIONAL LOCOMOTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER EINGABE IN EINEM OMNIDIREKTIONALEN FORTBEWEGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE ENTRÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE LOCOMOTION OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE

Publication

EP 3119487 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 15764824 A

Priority

  • US 201461955767 P
  • US 201461981149 P
  • US 201462004550 P
  • US 201562099426 P
  • US 201562127261 P
  • US 2015021614 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015143251A1] A virtual environment can use an absolute orientation framework. An absolute orientation framework in a virtual environment can be activated using an omnidirectional locomotion platform. An absolute orientation framework enables a user's avatar to move independently from the current viewpoint or camera position. The user's avatar can move in an absolute manner relative to a virtual environment map.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/214 (2014.01); A63F 13/212 (2014.01); A63F 13/24 (2014.01); A63F 13/428 (2014.01); A63F 13/5255 (2014.01); A63F 13/98 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/212 (2014.09); A63F 13/214 (2014.09); A63F 13/24 (2014.09); A63F 13/42 (2014.09); A63F 13/428 (2013.01); A63F 13/5255 (2014.09); A63F 13/98 (2014.09)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015143251 A1 20150924; AU 2015231135 A1 20161006; CN 106413827 A 20170215; EP 3119487 A1 20170125; EP 3119487 A4 20171018; KR 20160135314 A 20161125; RU 2016140373 A3 20180910; RU 2016140373 A 20180419

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-02 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1233573

2017-10-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170918

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/214 20140101AFI20170912BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/98 20140101ALN20170912BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/24 20140101ALI20170912BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/5255 20140101ALI20170912BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/428 20140101ALI20170912BHEP

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/212 20140101ALI20170912BHEP

2017-06-28 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-06-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOZA, RICARDO

2017-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOETGELUK, JAN

2017-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHUFFIELD, JAMES DOUGLAS

2017-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BESTER, DUANE

2017-02-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOZA, RICARDO

2017-02-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHUFFIELD, JAMES DOUGLAS

2017-02-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BESTER, DUANE

2017-02-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOETGELUK, JAN

2017-02-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BESTER, DUANE

2017-02-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHUFFIELD, JAMES DOUGLAS

2017-02-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOZA, RICARDO

2017-02-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOETGELUK, JAN

2017-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160916

2017-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-01-25 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2017-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME