EP 3123097 B1 20180509 - ARMED OPTOELECTRONIC TURRET
Title (en)
ARMED OPTOELECTRONIC TURRET
Title (de)
OPTOELEKTRONISCHER GESCHÜTZTURM
Title (fr)
TOURELLEAU OPTRONIQUE ARME
Publication
Application
Priority
- FR 1452728 A 20140328
- EP 2015056924 W 20150330
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2015144937A1] The invention relates to an armed optoelectronic turret including a body {3) pivoting around a bearing axis (Z), a weapon (15) rotatably secured to the body (3) according to the bearing axis (Z) and mounted such as to pivot about a first site axis (XI), and an optoelectronic viewfinder (6) mounted such as to pivot about the same bearing axis (Z) irrespective of the pivoting of the body (3) about the bearing axis (Z).
IPC 8 full level
F41A 23/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP RU)
F41A 23/24 (2013.01 - EP RU); F41G 3/22 (2013.01 - RU)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co.KG
- US 2012024143 A1 20120202 - SHACKLEE FRANK L [US], et al
- WO 2011033514 A1 20110324 - ISRAEL MILITARY IND [IL], et al
- WO 2011061562 A1 20110526 - NACION MINISTERIO DE DEFENSA FUERZA AEREA COLOMBIANA [CO], et al
- WO 2007086874 A2 20070802 - GROBER DAVID EHRLICH [US]
- EP 2306137 A1 20110406 - NEXTER SYSTEMS [FR]
- WO 2013058856 A2 20130425 - RAYTHEON CO [US], et al
- DE 2507451 A1 19760909 - WEGMANN & CO
- EP 1923657 A1 20080521 - SAAB AB [SE]
- US 3309962 A 19670321 - LYKAM CLARENCE W
- DE 3125678 A1 19830113 - BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]
- US 4518990 A 19850521 - GILVYDIS JAUNUTIS B [US]
- EP 1793195 A2 20070606 - FN HERSTAL SA [BE]
- US 2007208459 A1 20070906 - CHOI KEUN-KUG [KR]
- DE 10333647 A1 20050210 - KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]
- US 2011288804 A1 20111124 - LEE DONG HEE [KR], et al
- DE 3410467 A1 19850926 - RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]
- US 2660794 A 19531201 - GOERTZ RAYMOND C, et al
- DE 1578269 A1 19701210 - BOFORS AB
- EP 0111192 A1 19840620 - HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]
- DE 4306913 B4 20080703 - RHEINMETALL DEFENCE ELECT GMBH [DE]
- DE 102004003476 A1 20050818 - RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]
- US 2010269680 A1 20101028 - PERSSON ROLF [SE], et al
- US 2004050240 A1 20040318 - GREENE BEN A [AU], et al
- US 7870816 B1 20110118 - WILLINGHAM MICHAEL R [US], et al
- DE 1578279 A1 19711216 - MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM
- US 3505465 A 19700407 - REES DONALD W
- DE 3931883 C1 19901206
- EP 1467237 B1 20080507 - ZEISS CARL OPTRONICS GMBH [DE]
- EP 0016490 A1 19801001 - OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]
- US 2013192451 A1 20130801 - SCOTT STEVEN GREGORY [US], et al
- EP 0778952 B1 20021016 - AAI CORP [US]
- DE 102007002976 A1 20080724 - KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]
- DE 4396177 C2 20010201 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
- DE 10059313 A1 20020613 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
- US 2009086015 A1 20090402 - LARSEN JAN OVE [NO], et al
- DE 3229819 C2 19850214
- US 7614333 B2 20091110 - QUINN JAMES P [US], et al
- US 3685159 A 19720822 - ERHARD RUNE TORSTEN ISIDOR
- EP 0878686 B1 20030806 - KOLLMORGEN CORP [US]
- DE 102012102325 B3 20130718 - OXIMA TEC GMBH [DE]
- VALPOLINI P: "LIGHT REMOTELY CONTROLLED WEAPON STATIONS", ARMADA INTERNA- TIONAL, 1 February 2013 (2013-02-01), ZÜRICH, CH, pages 38 - 45, XP001580034, ISSN: 0252-9793
- FACHBUCH: "Elektrische Antriebstechnik", J. WEI- DAUER, ISBN: 978-3-89578-431-6
Opponent : NEXTER SYSTEMS
- US 2012024143 A1 20120202 - SHACKLEE FRANK L [US], et al
- WO 2011033514 A1 20110324 - ISRAEL MILITARY IND [IL], et al
- WO 2011061562 A1 20110526 - NACION MINISTERIO DE DEFENSA FUERZA AEREA COLOMBIANA [CO], et al
- WO 2007086874 A2 20070802 - GROBER DAVID EHRLICH [US]
- EP 2306137 A1 20110406 - NEXTER SYSTEMS [FR]
- WO 2013058856 A2 20130425 - RAYTHEON CO [US], et al
- EP 1923657 A1 20080521 - SAAB AB [SE]
- WO 03054471 A1 20030703 - BOFORS DEFENCE AB [SE], et al
- WO 0233342 A1 20020425 - ELECTRO OPTIC SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU], et al
- FR 2720513 A1 19951201 - METRAVIB SA [FR]
- US 2012177219 A1 20120712 - MULLEN RICHARD [US], et al
- US 2009251530 A1 20091008 - CILIA ANDREW [US]
- US 2011181722 A1 20110728 - GNESDA WILLIAM G [US], et al
- FR 2964818 A1 20120316 - THALES SA [FR]
- EP 1793195 B1 20090902 - FN HERSTAL SA [BE]
- US 6396235 B1 20020528 - ELLINGTON THOMAS W [US], et al
- US 2012191292 A1 20120726 - MCKEE MICHAEL A [US], et al
- US 2009200978 A1 20090813 - KATO TETSUAKI [JP], et al
- US 5994864 A 19991130 - INOUE YASUYUKI [JP], et al
- PAOLO VALPOLINI: "Light remotely controlled weapon stations", ARMADA INTERNATIONAL, 1 February 2013 (2013-02-01), pages 38 - 45, XP055558490
- PAOLO VALPOLINI: "Acoustic gunshot Détection systems", ARMADA INTERNATIONAL, April 2013 (2013-04-01), pages 38 - 49, XP055558501
- YANN TORREBEN: "Les nouveautés du renseignement", EUROSATORY 2012, no. 316, September 2012 (2012-09-01), XP055558517
- "Modélisation et analyse des systèmes asservis", TECHNIQUES DE L'INGÉNIEUR, March 2003 (2003-03-01), XP055558523
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2015144937 A1 20151001; AU 2015238173 A1 20161020; AU 2015238173 B2 20181213; CA 2943372 A1 20151001; CA 2943372 C 20181002; EP 3123097 A1 20170201; EP 3123097 B1 20180509; FR 3019279 A1 20151002; FR 3019279 B1 20180622; NO 3123097 T3 20181006; RU 2016142400 A 20180428; RU 2016142400 A3 20180428; RU 2672454 C2 20181114
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2015056924 W 20150330; AU 2015238173 A 20150330; CA 2943372 A 20150330; EP 15712661 A 20150330; FR 1452728 A 20140328; NO 15712661 A 20150330; RU 2016142400 A 20150330