Global Patent Index - EP 3123342 A4

EP 3123342 A4 2017-10-04 - CONFIGURABLE INPUT/OUTPUT UNIT

Title (en)

CONFIGURABLE INPUT/OUTPUT UNIT

Title (de)

KONFIGURIERBARE EIN-/AUSGABEEINHEIT

Title (fr)

UNITÉ D'ENTRÉE/SORTIE CONFIGURABLE

Publication

EP 3123342 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 15770026 A

Priority

  • US 201414226535 A
  • US 201414226561 A
  • US 201414226691 A
  • US 201414226595 A
  • CA 2015000085 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2015143533A1] Configurable input/output unit and configurable modular card provided therewith. The configurable input/output unit comprises a plurality of configurable inputs and outputs. The plurality of configurable inputs and outputs comprises a predefined output for sending a broadcast message and a predefined input for receiving a broadcast response message. The card comprises a board, at least one processor mounted on the board, at least one memory mounted on the board and in electronic communication with the processor, the configurable input/output unit comprising the plurality of configurable inputs and outputs, and a bus for providing electronic data exchange there between. The processor configures the plurality of inputs and outputs of the configurable input/output unit based on the broadcast response message. The processor may generate testing signals to the plurality of inputs and outputs of the configurable input/output unit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09B 9/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/38 (2006.01); G09B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/0806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] EP 1571510 A2 20050907 - ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]
  • [I] WO 0055697 A1 20000921 - SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMAT [US]
  • [I] ANONYMOUS: "Programmable logic controller - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", 23 March 2014 (2014-03-23), XP055240650, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Programmable_logic_controller&oldid=600943701> [retrieved on 20160112]
  • [I] "Siemens S7-400 Automation System Module Data", 31 August 2011 (2011-08-31), XP055244238, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://cache.industry.siemens.com/dl/files/740/1117740/att_23344/v1/module_data_en_en-US.pdf> [retrieved on 20160125]
  • [I] "Digital Avionics Handbook", 20 December 2000, CRC PRESS, article CARY R. SPITZER: "Digital Avionics Handbook", pages: 28 - 1, XP055390899
  • See also references of WO 2015143533A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2015143533 A1 20151001; CA 2882009 A1 20150416; CA 2882009 C 20170425; EP 3123342 A1 20170201; EP 3123342 A4 20171004

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 13/38 20060101ALI20170828BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09B 9/00 20060101AFI20170828BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09B 9/08 20060101ALI20170828BHEP

2017-07-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2017-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20161025

2017-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-02-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME