Global Patent Index - EP 3127654 A4

EP 3127654 A4 2017-05-31 - METAL PLATE, CUPBOARD AND METAL PLATE SURFACE-PROCESSING METHOD

Title (en)

METAL PLATE, CUPBOARD AND METAL PLATE SURFACE-PROCESSING METHOD

Title (de)

METALLPLATTE, SCHRANK UND OBERFLÄCHENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE METALLPLATTE

Title (fr)

PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE, ARMOIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DE PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE

Publication

EP 3127654 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 14888442 A

Priority

  • JP 2014072038 A
  • JP 2014078923 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP3127654A1] Object: An object is to provide a metal plate provided with higher aesthetics and better design, a storage case in which the metal plate is used, and a method for processing a surface of the metal plate with which the metal plate can be provided with higher aesthetics and better design. Means to Solve the Problem: In a configuration of a metal plate (110) according to the present invention, on a surface (110a) of the metal plate (110), a plurality of first polishing columns (112) are formed in parallel to each other, with multiple circular arc-shaped polishing marks being successively formed in a direction in which the circular arcs curve, and a plurality of second polishing columns (114) are formed in parallel to each other, with multiple circular arc-shaped polishing marks being successively formed, as in the first polishing columns (112), the second polishing columns (114) intersecting with and superimposed on the first polishing columns (112).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/19 (2006.01); B44C 1/20 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); B44F 1/02 (2006.01); B44F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/19 (2013.01); B44C 1/22 (2013.01); B44C 5/0415 (2013.01); B44F 1/02 (2013.01); B44F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3127654 A1 20170208; EP 3127654 A4 20170531; CN 106163739 A 20161123; JP WO2015151325 A1 20170413; WO 2015151325 A1 20151008

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170720

2017-07-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-05-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20170502

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 1/22 20060101ALI20170420BHEP

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44F 7/00 20060101ALI20170420BHEP

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44F 1/02 20060101ALI20170420BHEP

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 5/04 20060101ALI20170420BHEP

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B24B 7/19 20060101AFI20170420BHEP

2017-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B44C 1/20 20060101ALI20170420BHEP

2017-02-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20161012

2017-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME