Global Patent Index - EP 3162937 A1

EP 3162937 A1 2017-05-03 - BIELASTIC FABRIC AND ITS MANUFACTURING PROCESS

Title (en)

BIELASTIC FABRIC AND ITS MANUFACTURING PROCESS

Title (de)

BIELASTISCHER STOFF UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

TISSU BIÉLASTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 3162937 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 15191811 A

Priority

EP 15191811 A

Abstract (en)

There are described a bielastic fabric comprising biopolyamide yarn and elastane yarn, having excellent elastic properties and high dimensional stability, and a cost-effective, efficient process for obtaining it.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/18 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2331/08 (2013.01); D10B 2401/061 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 0181443 A2 20011101 - DU PONT [US]

Citation (search report)

  • [IY] US 2006021387 A1 20060202 - CHUANG CHENG-YUAN [TW], et al
  • [Y] M. MISRA, V. NAGARAJAN, J. REDDY, A.K. MOHANTY: "Bioplastics and green composites from renewable resources: where we are and future directions!", 26 August 2011 (2011-08-26), XP055266245, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.iccm-central.org/Proceedings/ICCM18proceedings/data/2.%20Oral%20Presentation/Aug23(Tuesday)/T03%20Composite%20Materials%20from%20Biorenewable%20Resources/T3-6-AF1961.pdf> [retrieved on 20160418]
  • [Y] ANA MARIJA GRANCARI, IVONA JERKOVI, ANITA TARBUK: "Bioplastics in Textiles", 24 April 2013 (2013-04-24), XP002756640, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://hrcak.srce.hr/index.php?show=clanak&id_clanak_jezik=156234> [retrieved on 20160418]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3162937 A1 20170503; CA 3002488 A1 20170504; WO 2017072127 A1 20170504

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20161026

2017-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-05-03 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2017-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME