Global Patent Index - EP 3163477 A1

EP 3163477 A1 2017-05-03 - SIMULATION METHOD, SIMULATION APPARATUS, AND SIMULATION PROGRAM FOR COUPLED SIMULATION OF STRUCTURAL-ELASTIC EFFECTS AND HEAT CONDUCTION

Title (en)

SIMULATION METHOD, SIMULATION APPARATUS, AND SIMULATION PROGRAM FOR COUPLED SIMULATION OF STRUCTURAL-ELASTIC EFFECTS AND HEAT CONDUCTION

Title (de)

SIMULATIONSVERFAHREN, SIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SIMULATIONSPROGRAMM FÜR DIE GEKOPPELTE SIMULATION VON STRUKTURELLEN ELASTISCHEN EFFEKTEN UND WÄRMELEITUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME POUR LA SIMULATION COUPLÉE DES EFFETS STRUCTURELS ÉLASTIQUES ET DE CONDUCTION DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 3163477 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 16183411 A

Priority

  • JP 2015173647 A
  • JP 2016017588 A

Abstract (en)

Provided is a simulation method capable of suppressing lengthening of a calculation time when performing a simulation of a heat conduction phenomenon in combination with motion analysis of a structural-elastic phenomenon. A coupled simulation of a structural-elastic phenomenon and a heat conduction phenomenon of a simulation target including plural particles is performed. Here, numerical calculation of a motion equation capable of being transformed into an equation of the same form as that of a heat conduction equation is performed with respect to a term of a spatial temperature distribution and a term of a derivative of temperature with respect to time, to perform a simulation of the heat conduction phenomenon of the simulation target.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/5009 (2013.01); G06F 2217/16 (2013.01); G06F 2217/80 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • JP 5441422 B2 20140312
  • ERIKBITZEK; PEKKA KOSKINEN; FRANZ GAHLER; MICHAEL MOSELER; PETER GUMBSCH: "Structural Relaxation Made Simple", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, vol. 97, 2006, pages 170201
  • "Advanced Quantum Mechanics", 1967, ADDISON WESLEY

Citation (search report)

  • [I] EP 2899655 A1 20150729 - SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]
  • [I] US 6915245 B1 20050705 - HINTON FREDERICK L [US], et al
  • [A] ERIK BITZEK ET AL: "Structural Relaxation Made Simple", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, vol. 97, no. 17, 1 October 2006 (2006-10-01), US, XP055355986, ISSN: 0031-9007, DOI: 10.1103/PhysRevLett.97.170201
  • [I] MONAGHAN J J: "Smoothed particle hydrodynamics; Smoothed particle hydrodynamics", REPORTS ON PROGRESS IN PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 68, no. 8, 1 August 2005 (2005-08-01), pages 1703 - 1759, XP020084661, ISSN: 0034-4885, DOI: 10.1088/0034-4885/68/8/R01
  • [A] GUO ZENGYUAN ET AL: "Molecular Dynamics Simulation of Heat Propagation in Liquid Argon", TSINGHUA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, TSINGHUA UNIVERSITY PRESS, BEIJING, CN, vol. 2, no. 2, 1 June 1997 (1997-06-01), pages 613 - 618, XP011376293, ISSN: 1007-0214, DOI: 10.1109/TST.1997.6078062

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3163477 A1 20170503; JP 2017049971 A 20170309

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170411

2017-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160809

2017-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-05-03 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN

- Countries: MA MD

2017-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME