EP 3179987 A1 20170621 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF ETORICOXIB
Title (en)
PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF ETORICOXIB
Title (de)
PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON ETORICOXIB
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE D'ETORICOXIB
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 2014066560 W 20140731
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016015776A1] The present invention relates to a pharmaceutical composition comprising etoricoxib, at least one pH modifier and optionally at least one additional pharmaceutically acceptable excipient. In particular, the pH modifier is selected from the group of excipients having a pH value of a 1 % (w/v) aqueous dispersion, preferably suspension, above 6.6, preferably above 7.0.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 9/2009 (2013.01); A61K 9/2054 (2013.01); A61K 31/444 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2016015776A1
Citation (examination)
- FMC: "Avicel PH-112", 1 January 2015 (2015-01-01), fmchealthandnutrition.com, pages 1 - 2, XP055472849, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.fmchealthandnutrition.com> [retrieved on 20180504]
- FMC: "Avicel PH-102", 1 January 2015 (2015-01-01), XP055472852, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.fmchealthandnutrition.com> [retrieved on 20180504]
- "Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients", 1 January 2006, article ROWE: "Povidone", XP055472856
- "Handbook of Pharmaceutical Exciepients", 1 January 2006, article ROWE: "Croscarmellose sodium", XP055472858
- EYJOLFSSON: "Why are aqueous suspensions of the coarse grades of anhydrous calcium hydrogen phosphate acidic?", PHARMAZIE, vol. 65, 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), pages 527, XP055472865
- ANONYMOUS: "Dicalcium phosphate, Innophos", 1 January 2013 (2013-01-01), XP055472861, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.innophos.com> [retrieved on 20180504]
- "Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients", 1 January 2009, article ROWE: "Calcium Phosphate, Dibasic Anhydrous", XP055472866
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2014066560 W 20140731; EP 14748167 A 20140731