EP 3180496 B1 20201104 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POSITION AND ORIENTATION DETECTION OF A DOWNHOLE DEVICE
Title (en)
SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POSITION AND ORIENTATION DETECTION OF A DOWNHOLE DEVICE
Title (de)
SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DER POSITION UND AUSRICHTUNG EINER BOHRLOCHVORRICHTUNG
Title (fr)
SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LA DÉTECTION DE LA POSITION ET DE L'ORIENTATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FOND DE PUITS
Publication
Application
Priority
- NO 20140989 A 20140814
- NO 2015050134 W 20150814
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016024867A1] This publication relates to a system and a method for identifying or monitoring the orientation and position of a device, such as a tool, intended to be moved through or be stationary arranged a medium, such as rock, the system comprises an orientation unit (10) including an outer element (11) and an inner element (12). The system comprises further: -a fixed reference point member (13) is arranged on one element of the orientation unit; -at least one detector (15) for at any time sensing and thus identifying the position of the fixed reference point member(13); -at least one second detector (16) for sensing earth gravity; -device(s) for connecting the at least one first detector (15) and the at least one second detector (16) with a processor or retrieving collected data from said at least one first detector (15) and said at least one second detector (16), using such data from said at least one first detector (15) and said at least one second detector (16) for calculating and determining the rotational orientation of the fixed reference point member (13) relative to earth gravity.
IPC 8 full level
E21B 47/024 (2006.01); E21B 25/16 (2006.01); E21B 47/022 (2012.01); G01C 21/16 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP NO)
E21B 25/16 (2013.01 - EP); E21B 47/0228 (2020.05 - EP); E21B 47/0236 (2020.05 - EP); E21B 47/024 (2013.01 - EP NO); E21B 44/00 (2013.01 - NO)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Devico AS.
- US 2009056938 A1 20090305 - TREVIRANUS JOACHIM [DE], et al
- WO 2014007796 A1 20140109 - HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al
- US 2011253452 A1 20111020 - BEUERSHAUSEN CHRIS C [US], et al
- US 2011196612 A1 20110811 - BONAVIDES CLOVIS [US], et al
- US 2004231893 A1 20041125 - KENT GERALD EDWARD [CA]
- US 2008201969 A1 20080828 - DAVIES EVAN L [US], et al
- US 2120670 A 19380614 - HYER ROBERT S
- US 2327658 A 19430824 - MILLER LEONIDAS C
- US 2419468 A 19470422 - SMITH GEORGE A
- US 2425319 A 19470812 - DONALD HERING
- US 2711879 A 19550628 - ROLAND RING
- US 2207505 A 19400709 - BREMNER CARL ST J, et al
- WO 2013028075 A1 20130228 - DEVICO AS [NO], et al
- JP 2011140824 A 20110721 - MAEDA CONSTRUCTION, et al
- BUCHANAN ANDREW, ET AL: "Geomagnetic Referencing - The Real-Time Compass for Directional Drillers", OILFIELD REVIEW, vol. 25, no. 3, 1 January 2013 (2013-01-01), pages 32 - 47, XP055828537
- DUNCAN LEN: "Wellbore Positioning Past, Present and Future", SPE INTERNATIONAL 44TH GENERAL MEETING SEPTEMBER 22, 2016 GLASGOW, SCOTLAND, 1 September 2016 (2016-09-01), pages 1 - 40, XP055828545
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2016024867 A1 20160218; AU 2015302416 A1 20170223; AU 2015302416 B2 20200820; AU 2015302416 C1 20220127; CA 2956836 A1 20160218; CA 2956836 C 20191112; EP 3180496 A1 20170621; EP 3180496 A4 20180314; EP 3180496 B1 20201104; NO 20140989 A1 20160215; NO 342903 B1 20180827
DOCDB simple family (application)
NO 2015050134 W 20150814; AU 2015302416 A 20150814; CA 2956836 A 20150814; EP 15832382 A 20150814; NO 20140989 A 20140814