EP 3182517 A1 20170621 - WIDE BAND ANTENNA
Title (en)
WIDE BAND ANTENNA
Title (de)
BREITBANDANTENNE
Title (fr)
ANTENNE À LARGE BANDE
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 15250022 A 20151218
Abstract (en)
A method of manufacturing a wide band antenna comprising a signal generator coupled, via a transmission line, to a feed region (7) of at least one antenna element comprising an upper loop (1) and a lower loop (3), said upper loop (1) comprising a first conductive loop element (2) defined by an upper conductor (9) and a first conductive blade member (10) that tapers outwardly to form a flare portion (11) adjacent a distal end of said upper conductor (9), said lower loop (3) comprising a second conductive loop element (4) defined by a base conductor (5) and a second conductive blade member (6) that tapers outwardly to form a flare portion (8) adjacent a distal end of said base conductor (5), said first and second conductive blade members (10, 6) defining, between their facing edges, a notch which opens outwardly from said feed region (7), the method comprising the steps of: matching, at a desired operating frequency range, an impedance of said antenna element to said transmission line; selecting a cut-off frequency of said antenna element; selecting the length of the upper conductor (9) according to said selected cut-off frequency; and, subsequently selecting the remaining peripheral dimensions of the upper loop such that, combined, they are substantially equal to a wavelength corresponding to the selected cut-off frequency.
IPC 8 full level
H01Q 13/08 (2006.01); H01Q 5/25 (2015.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01Q 5/25 (2015.01); H01Q 13/085 (2013.01); H01Q 21/064 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- GODARD ET AL.: "RADAR CONFERENCE", 2008, IEEE, article "Size reduction and radiation optimization on UWB antenna"
- KOSHELEV ET AL.: "High-Power Ultrawideband Radiation Source with Multielement Array Antenna", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HIGH CURRENT ELECTRONICS, TOMSK, RUSSIA, July 2004 (2004-07-01)
- GODARD, A. ET AL.: "A transient UWB Antenna Array Used with Complex Impedance Surfaces", HINDAWI, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, vol. 2010
Citation (search report)
- [XD] A. GODARD ET AL: "A Transient UWB Antenna Array Used with Complex Impedance Surfaces", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, vol. 12, no. 24, 1 January 2010 (2010-01-01), pages 329 - 8, XP055278410, ISSN: 1687-5869, DOI: 10.1109/8.59765
- [A] YU A ANDREEV ET AL: "Combined antennas for radiating ultrawideband short pulses", 2008 5TH EUROPEAN RADAR CONFERENCE (EURAD 2008); 30-31 OCT. 2008, AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 30 October 2008 (2008-10-30), pages 208 - 211, XP031411464, ISBN: 978-2-87487-009-5
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 15250022 A 20151218; EP 16203821 A 20161213