EP 3182824 A4 20180103 - A NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR PLANTS AND A METHOD OF PREPARATION THEREOF
Title (en)
A NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR PLANTS AND A METHOD OF PREPARATION THEREOF
Title (de)
NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR PFLANZEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE POUR PLANTES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARER
Publication
Application
Priority
IB 2014001568 W 20140820
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016027112A1] A nutritional composition for plants and a method of preparing the same is disclosed. The nutritional composition comprising silica nanoparticles having at least one micronutrient adsorbed thereon, wherein the micronutrient comprises at least 1 % (w/w) of the nutritional composition, the nutritional composition having particle size not more than 1000 nm.
IPC 8 full level
A01N 25/08 (2006.01); A01N 59/16 (2006.01); A01N 59/20 (2006.01); C05D 9/00 (2006.01); C05D 9/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A01N 25/08 (2013.01); C05D 9/00 (2013.01); C05D 9/02 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XYI] US 2012198900 A1 20120809 - LIU CHUANPING [CN], et al
- [X] US 2013108702 A1 20130502 - SANTRA SWADESHMUKUL [US]
- [IY] US 2004099029 A1 20040527 - NODA TAKANOBU [JP], et al
- [X] AMIT SINGH ET AL: "Copper Coated Silica Nanoparticles for Odor removal", vol. 26, no. 20, 14 September 2010 (2010-09-14), pages 15837 - 15844, XP002739110, ISSN: 0743-7463, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/la100793u> [retrieved on 20100914], DOI: 10.1021/LA100793U
- [XI] MIKRAJUDDIN ET AL: "Stable photoluminescence of zinc oxide quantum dots in silica nanoparticles matrix prepared by the combined sol-gel and spray drying method", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, vol. 89, no. 11, 1 June 2001 (2001-06-01), pages 6431 - 6434, XP012052247, ISSN: 0021-8979, DOI: 10.1063/1.1360706
- [X] YANG T I ET AL: "Controlled synthesis of coreshell ironsilica nanoparticles and their magneto-dielectric properties in polymer composites;Controlled synthesis of coreshell ironsilica nanoparticles and their magneto-dielectric properties in polymer composites", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 22, no. 10, 2 February 2011 (2011-02-02), pages 105601, XP020191600, ISSN: 0957-4484, DOI: 10.1088/0957-4484/22/10/105601
- [X] RÉMY GUILLET-NICOLAS ET AL: "Manganese-impregnated mesoporous silica nanoparticles for signal enhancement in MRI cell labelling studies", NANOSCALE, vol. 5, no. 23, 7 October 2013 (2013-10-07), United Kingdom, pages 11499, XP055426942, ISSN: 2040-3364, DOI: 10.1039/c3nr02969g
- See references of WO 2016027112A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2016027112 A1 20160225; EP 3182824 A1 20170628; EP 3182824 A4 20180103
DOCDB simple family (application)
IB 2014001568 W 20140820; EP 14900034 A 20140820