Global Patent Index - EP 3193159 A9

EP 3193159 A9 2017-10-11 - GROUP AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE GAS CONTENT IN CLOSED CONTAINERS AND AN AUTOMATIC FILLING AND/OR PACKAGING PLANT USING SUCH A GROUP

Title (en)

GROUP AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE GAS CONTENT IN CLOSED CONTAINERS AND AN AUTOMATIC FILLING AND/OR PACKAGING PLANT USING SUCH A GROUP

Title (de)

GRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES GASINHALTS IN GESCHLOSSENEN BEHÄLTERN UND EINER AUTOMATISCHEN FÜLL- UND / ODER VERPACKUNGSANLAGE MIT EINER SOLCHEN GRUPPE

Title (fr)

GROUPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DU CONTENU DE GAZ DANS DES RÉCIPIENTS FERMÉS ET UNE INSTALLATION AUTOMATIQUE DE REMPLISSAGE ET / OU D'EMBALLAGE UTILISANT UN TEL GROUPE

Publication

EP 3193159 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 17151329 A

Priority

IT UB20169954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP3193159A1] The present invention relates to a measuring group and method of the gas content in closed containers, as well as an automatic filling and/or packaging plant using such a group. In particular, the present invention relates to a measuring group of the gas content in closed containers (30, 30', 30", 130) made of optically transparent material at least at a portion of a head space (31, 131) of the same, which comprises at least one housing seat (14,114) of at least one portion of a head space (31, 131) of a closed container (30, 30', 30", 130) of such closed containers; at least one laser source (22, 122) for emitting a laser beam (20, 120) at a wavelength tuneable with an absorption wavelength of a gas contained in the head space (31, 131) of the closed container, the at least one laser source (22, 122) being positioned in such a way as to direct the laser beam (20, 120) towards the at least one housing seat (14,114); and is characterised in that it comprises at least one delimiting surface (17, 18, 117) if the at least one housing seat (14, 114) comprising at least one portion (16, 16', 16", 116) with a high diffusion coefficient, the portion (16, 16', 16", 116) with a high diffusion coefficient facing the at least one laser source (22, 122); and at least one detector (21,121) positioned in such a way as to detect at least one portion of the laser beam (20, 120) emitted by the laser source (22, 122) once passed through the housing seat (14, 114) and diffused by the portion with a high diffusion coefficient (16, 16', 16", 116), and to provide output data representative of an absorption spectrum of the gas consequent to a plurality of passes of the laser beam (20, 120) through the housing seat (14, 114).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/3504 (2014.01); G01N 21/39 (2006.01); G01N 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/3504 (2013.01); G01N 21/39 (2013.01); G01N 33/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3193159 A1 20170719; EP 3193159 A9 20171011; EP 3193159 B1 20180912; IT UB20169954 A1 20170713

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-04-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180316

2018-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20180119

2018-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-07-19 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME