EP 3214207 A1 20170906 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANTIMONY NANOWIRES
Title (en)
PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ANTIMONY NANOWIRES
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANTIMONNANODRÄHTEN
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE NANOFILS D'ANTIMOINE
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 16157979 A 20160301
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to a process for producing antimony nanowires comprising at least the process step of electrochemically depositing antimony directly onto at least one surface of an electrode from a solution comprising at least one antimony compound (A), at least one gallium compound (B) and at least one ionic liquid (C).
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
C25D 3/54 (2013.01); C25D 3/665 (2013.01); C25D 1/006 (2013.01); C25D 1/04 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- WO 2012170311 A2 20121213 - UNIV WASHINGTON STATE RES FDN [US], et al
- WO 2013052456 A1 20130411 - NANOSYS INC [US]
- WO 2015071189 A1 20150521 - BASF SE [DE], et al
- GO-PAL SAPKOTA; U PHILIPOSE, SEMICOND. SCI. TECHNOL., vol. 29, 2014, pages 035001
- CH. SCHOENDORFER; A. LUGSTEIN; Y.-J. HYUN; E. BERTAGNOLLI; L. BISCHOFF; P. M. NELLEN; V. CALLEGARI; P. PONGRATZ, J. APPL. PHYS., vol. 102, 2007, pages 044308
- D. BOUCHET ET AL., EUR. PHYS. J. APPL. PHYS., vol. 30, 2005, pages 193
- Y. CHEN ET AL., MATER. CHEM. PHYS., vol. 126, 2011, pages 386
- A. LAHIRI ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., vol. 54, 2015, pages 11870
Citation (search report)
- [A] YANG M-H ET AL: "ELECTRODEPOSITION OF ANTIMONY IN A WATER-STABLE 1-ETHYL-3-METHYLIMIDAZOLIUM CHLORIDE TETRAFLUOROBORATE ROOM TEMPERATURE IONIC LIQUID", JOURNAL OF APPLIED ELECTROCHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 33, no. 11, 1 November 2003 (2003-11-01), pages 1077 - 1084, XP001225266, ISSN: 0021-891X, DOI: 10.1023/A:1026223314259
- [AD] YANBIAO CHEN ET AL: "Orientation-controllable growth of Sb nanowire arrays by pulsed electrodeposition", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V. NETHERLANDS, vol. 126, no. 1-2, 15 March 2011 (2011-03-15), pages 386 - 390, XP002760463, ISSN: 0254-0584, DOI: 10.1016/J.MATCHEMPHYS.2010.11.005
- [A] DHIA A. HABBOUSH ET AL: "Electrochemical studies of antimony(III) and antimony(V) in molten mixtures of aluminum chloride and butylpyridinium chloride", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 23, no. 12, 1 June 1984 (1984-06-01), EASTON, US, pages 1726 - 1734, XP055292791, ISSN: 0020-1669, DOI: 10.1021/ic00180a018
- [A] ABHISHEK LAHIRI ET AL: "Stromlose Abscheidung von III-V-Halbleiternanostrukturen aus ionischen Flüssigkeiten bei Raumtemperatur", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, vol. 127, no. 40, 28 September 2015 (2015-09-28), DE, pages 12038 - 12042, XP055292754, ISSN: 0044-8249, DOI: 10.1002/ange.201504764
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 16157979 A 20160301