EP 3221712 A4 20180829 - NON-CONTACT ELECTRICITY METERS
Title (en)
NON-CONTACT ELECTRICITY METERS
Title (de)
KONTAKTLOSE STROMZÄHLER
Title (fr)
COMPTEURS D'ÉLECTRICITÉ SANS CONTACT
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201462082994 P 20141121
- US 2015061426 W 20151118
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016081657A1] The present disclosure provides for a device which is a non-contact metering of a current, a voltage, power, and/or energy.
IPC 8 full level
G01R 33/02 (2006.01); G01R 19/165 (2006.01); G01R 33/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G01R 19/165 (2013.01 - US); G01R 19/1659 (2013.01 - US); G01R 19/2513 (2013.01 - US); G01R 33/02 (2013.01 - EP US); G01R 33/06 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2013076343 A1 20130328 - CARPENTER GARY D [US], et al
- [X] US 2014320125 A1 20141030 - LEEB STEVEN B [US], et al
- [X] US 2013271895 A1 20131017 - KUHNS HAMPDEN [US]
- [X] US 8805628 B2 20140812 - PATEL SHWETAK N [US], et al
- [X] US 2012001617 A1 20120105 - REYNOLDS BRETT S [US]
- [X] US 2001040446 A1 20011115 - LAPINKSI STERLING [US], et al
- [X] US 2014210460 A1 20140731 - KUHNS HAMPDEN [US]
- [X] US 2012319676 A1 20121220 - EL-ESSAWY WAEL [US], et al
- [X] US 5767668 A 19980616 - DURAND DOMINIQUE M [US]
- [X] US 2008077336 A1 20080327 - FERNANDES ROOSEVELT [US]
- [AD] US 4853639 A 19890801 - VOSTEEN WILLIAM [US], et al
- [AD] US 5617020 A 19970401 - CAMPBELL GREGORY A [US], et al
- [A] US 2013211751 A1 20130815 - PARK DANIEL J [US], et al
- [A] US 6026355 A 20000215 - RAHMAN MIZANUR [US], et al
- [A] US 2010060479 A1 20100311 - SALTER GEOFFREY DAVID VINCENT [CA]
- [X] GABRIELE D'ANTONA ET AL: "Processing Magnetic Sensor Array Data for AC Current Measurement in Multiconductor Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 50, no. 5, 1 October 2001 (2001-10-01), XP011025354, ISSN: 0018-9456
- [X] ANISOARA PARASCHIV-IONESCU ET AL: "Source Separation Based Processing for Integrated Hall Sensor Arrays", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 2, no. 6, 1 December 2002 (2002-12-01), XP011065704, ISSN: 1530-437X
- [X] YAO J ET AL: "THEORETICAL INVESTIGATION ON THE INTERFERENCE REJECTION FOR THE CURRENT MEASUREMENT USING MAGNETIC SENSOR ARRAYS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, TOKYO, JP, vol. E87-C, no. 8, 1 August 2004 (2004-08-01), pages 1281 - 1285, XP001201428, ISSN: 0916-8524
- [A] MACIEJ A NORAS: "Solid state electric field sensor", PROC. ESA ANNUAL MEETING ON ELECTROSTATICS, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), XP055492573
- See references of WO 2016081657A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2016081657 A1 20160526; AU 2015349968 A1 20170608; EP 3221712 A1 20170927; EP 3221712 A4 20180829; US 2018306846 A1 20181025
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2015061426 W 20151118; AU 2015349968 A 20151118; EP 15860605 A 20151118; US 201515527296 A 20151118