Global Patent Index - EP 3224185 A1

EP 3224185 A1 2017-10-04 - PASSENGER TRANSPORT DEVICE

Title (en)

PASSENGER TRANSPORT DEVICE

Title (de)

PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNES

Publication

EP 3224185 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 15794183 A

Priority

  • DE 102014117563 A
  • EP 2015076505 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2016083150A1] The invention relates to a passenger transport device (200), in particular an escalator or a moving walkway, having transport elements (251) Iinterconnected to form an endless belt (250) and a drive (230) for the transport elements (251), wherein the drive (230) comprises at least a motor (231), a transmission (233) and a drive shaft (240) functionally connected by the transmission (233) to the motor, the transport elements (251) interconnected to form an endless belt (250) are guided by means of the drive shaft (240) and can be moved by the drive shaft (240), a carrier (210) in which the transport elements (251) interconnected to form an endless belt (250) are arranged in such a way that they can be guided, the drive (230) is arranged on a frame (245), and the frame (245) is mounted on the outside of the frame (210). The invention also relates to a method for mounting a passenger transport device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 102014117563 A1 20160602; CN 107207214 A 20170926; EA 201791187 A1 20170929; EP 3224185 A1 20171004; WO 2016083150 A1 20160602

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180921

2018-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP AG

2018-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR AG

2018-03-07 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NOESKE, NILS PATRICK

2017-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEINKE, MATHIAS

2017-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOEGE, JENS

2017-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISCHGANEIT, RONNY

2017-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170519

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME