Global Patent Index - EP 3224438 A1

EP 3224438 A1 2017-10-04 - ARRANGEMENT CONSISTING OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND AN EJECTING DEVICE

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT CONSISTING OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND AN EJECTING DEVICE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG AUS EINEM MÖBEL UND EINER AUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT D'UN MEUBLE ET D'UN DISPOSITIF D'EJECTION

Publication

EP 3224438 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 15791237 A

Priority

  • AT 8552014 A
  • AT 2015000131 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2016081960A1] The invention relates to an ejecting device (1) for ejecting a cover element (2) movably mounted on a piece of furniture (13), in particular a folding door or folding/sliding door, from a closed position into an open position. The cover element (2) can be moved at least in one direction (11) perpendicular to the closing plane, on which the cover element (2) is arranged in the closed position, and in one direction (12) parallel to the closing plane. The ejecting device (1) comprises an energy accumulator (7), which is to be charged manually by a user, and an ejecting element (5), on which the energy accumulator (7) acts, and the energy accumulator (7) can be charged by moving the cover element (2) substantially in a direction (12) parallel to the closing plane, preferably during an ongoing cover element (2) opening process following the ejection process, particularly preferably immediately following the ejection process.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/26 (2006.01); E05D 15/58 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/227 (2013.01); E05D 15/264 (2013.01); E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05F 1/1041 (2013.01); E05F 1/1066 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/232 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/426 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/212 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

WO 2016081960 A1 20160602; AT 516586 A1 20160615; CN 107002438 A 20170801; CN 107002438 B 20180921; EP 3224438 A1 20171004; JP 2018500482 A 20180111; US 2017247924 A1 20170831

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180928

2018-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/58 20060101ALI20180903BHEP

2018-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 1/10 20060101ALI20180903BHEP

2018-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/26 20060101AFI20180903BHEP

2018-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180308

2018-03-07 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

2017-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME