Global Patent Index - EP 3225542 A1

EP 3225542 A1 2017-10-04 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A CONTROL CUFF FOR A ROTOR BLADE OF A HINGE- AND BEARINGLESS ROTOR

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A CONTROL CUFF FOR A ROTOR BLADE OF A HINGE- AND BEARINGLESS ROTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KONTROLLMANSCHETTE FÜR EIN ROTORBLATT EINES SCHARNIER- UND LAGERLOSEN ROTORS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MANCHON DE COMMANDE POUR UNE PALE D'UN ROTOR SANS PALIER ET CHARNIÈRE

Publication

EP 3225542 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 16400007 A

Priority

EP 16400007 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is related to a method of manufacturing a control cuff (3) for a rotor blade of a hinge- and bearingless rotor. The method comprises at least the steps of: Manufacturing an outer shell (10), Manufacturing a stiffener member (9) by means of an automated process, Inserting the stiffener member (9) into the outer shell (10), and Bonding the stiffener member (9) to the outer shell (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/635 (2013.01); B22F 5/00 (2013.01); B22F 7/08 (2013.01); B23C 3/00 (2013.01); B29C 65/542 (2013.01); B29C 70/382 (2013.01); B29D 99/0025 (2013.01); B32B 37/0038 (2013.01); B32B 37/1284 (2013.01); B32B 37/16 (2013.01); B32B 37/24 (2013.01); B32B 38/0004 (2013.01); B64C 27/33 (2013.01); B64C 27/51 (2013.01); B64C 27/72 (2013.01); B23C 2220/48 (2013.01); B32B 2305/076 (2013.01); B32B 2603/00 (2013.01); B32B 2605/18 (2013.01); B33Y 10/00 (2014.12); B33Y 80/00 (2014.12); B64C 2027/7216 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5462408 A 19951031 - COFFY RENE LOUIS [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3225542 A1 20171004; EP 3225542 B1 20180509; US 2017283051 A1 20171005

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-09-12 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20180509

2018-05-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-05-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602016003002

2018-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 997365 T

- Effective date: 20180515

2018-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-02-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180125

2017-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170914

2017-10-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME