Global Patent Index - EP 3228756 A1

EP 3228756 A1 2017-10-11 - MACHINE TOOL AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A SOIL

Title (en)

MACHINE TOOL AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A SOIL

Title (de)

ARBEITSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES BODENS

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE TRAVAIL ET PROCEDE DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT D'UN SOL

Publication

EP 3228756 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 16163646 A

Priority

EP 16163646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2017284162A1] A machine and a method for earth-working with a machine, having a mast, along which a top drive can be moved vertically by an adjusting device, through which top drive a telescopic kelly bar is displaceably guided, which has at least one outer kelly bar, which is designed to come to lie on the top drive, and one inner kelly bar, which comprises a rope suspension for a rope, through which the inner kelly bar is moved vertically by a rope winch. The adjusting device for the top drive and/or the main rope winch for the kelly bar is/are automatically controlled, wherein the inner kelly bar is moved relative to the top drive in some areas in a rapid travel mode at a first speed and in some areas in a conservative travel mode, in which the speed is reduced in comparison with the first speed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Arbeitsmaschine und ein Verfahren zum Bearbeiten eines Bodens mit einer Arbeitsmaschine mit einem Mast, entlang welchem mittels einer Stelleinrichtung ein Kraftdrehkopf vertikal verfahrbar ist, durch welchen ein teleskopierbares Kellygestänge verschiebbar geführt wird, welches zumindest eine Außenkellystange, die zur Auflage auf den Kraftdrehkopf ausgebildet ist, und eine Innenkellystange aufweist, welche eine Seilaufhängung für ein Seil umfasst, durch welches mittels einer Seilwinde die Innenkellystange vertikal verfahren wird, wobei der Boden mit einem Bodenbearbeitungswerkzeug bearbeitet wird, welches an einem unteren Ende der Kellystange angebracht ist. Gemäß der Erfindung ist vorgesehen, dass die Stelleinrichtung für den Kraftdrehkopf und/oder die Hauptseilwinde für das Kellygestänge mittels einer Steuereinrichtung automatisch gesteuert werden, wobei die Innenkellystange relativ zum Kraftdrehkopf bereichsweise mit einem Schnellfahrmodus mit einer ersten Geschwindigkeit und bereichsweise mit einem Schonfahrmodus verfahren wird, bei welchem die Geschwindigkeit gegenüber der ersten Geschwindigkeit des Schnellfahrmodus reduziert ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/34 (2006.01); E02D 5/38 (2006.01); E02D 7/22 (2006.01); E02D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/008 (2013.01); E02D 5/34 (2013.01); E02D 5/38 (2013.01); E02D 7/22 (2013.01); E02D 11/00 (2013.01); E21B 7/02 (2013.01); E21B 15/00 (2013.01); E21B 17/07 (2013.01); E21B 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3228756 A1 20171011; EP 3228756 B1 20180912; CN 107269259 A 20171020; RU 2017110390 A3 20181001; RU 2017110390 A 20181001; US 2017284162 A1 20171005

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1040735 T

- Effective date: 20181015

2018-10-04 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502016001897

2018-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-05-04 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1238691

2017-12-20 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171122

2017-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160727

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME