Global Patent Index - EP 3228889 A1

EP 3228889 A1 2017-10-11 - TRACK ELEMENT FOR A LARGE-DIAMETER ROLLING BEARING AND BEARING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

TRACK ELEMENT FOR A LARGE-DIAMETER ROLLING BEARING AND BEARING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

LAUFBAHNELEMENT FÜR EIN GROSSWÄLZLAGER UND LAGERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ÉLÉMENT DE CHEMIN DE ROULEMENT POUR UN ROULEMENT DE GRANDE DIMENSION ET ENSEMBLE DE PALIER

Publication

EP 3228889 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 17173907 A

Priority

  • EP 09006156 A
  • EP 10722591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2010127860A1] The invention relates to a roller bearing element for a large roller bearing comprising the following features: at least one contact zone with a mating roller bearing element, the contact zone has an inductively hardened surface layer, the roller bearing element is composed of a steel which has an admixture of carbon of at least 0.46% by mass.

Abstract (de)

Ein Wälzlagerelement für ein Großwälzlager, weist folgende Merkmale auf: - wenigstens eine Kontaktzone zu einem Wälzlagergegenelement, - die Kontaktzone weist eine induktiv gehärtete Oberflächenschicht auf, - das Wälzlagerelement besteht aus einem Stahl, der eine Beimischung von Kohlenstoff von mindestens 0,46 Masse% aufweist, - die Oberflächenschicht weist eine maximale Härte auf, die geringer als die maximal erreichbare Härte des verwendeten Stahls ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/64 (2013.01); F16C 19/163 (2013.01); F16C 2300/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party : ThyssenkruppRothe Erde GmbH

  • EP 09006156 A 20090506
  • WO 2010127860 A1 20101111 - SKF AB [SE], et al
  • WO 03060170 A1 20030724 - TIMKEN CO [US]
  • WIRTSCHAFTSVEREINIGUNG STAHL MARKETING: "Merkblatt 450- Wärmebehandlung von Stahl - Härten, Anlassen, Vergüten, Bainitisieren", 2005, pages 1 - 37, XP055476420, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http//:www.stahl-online.de/wp-content/uploads/2013/10/MB450-Waermebehandlung-von-Stahl.pdf>
  • WIRTSCHAFTSVEREINIGUNG STAHL: "Merkblatt 236- Wärmebehandlung von Stahl - Randschichthärten", 2009, pages 1 - 39, XP055476437, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.stahl-online.de/wp-content/uploads/2013/10/MB236WaermebehandlungvonStahlRandschichthaerten.pdf>
  • EDELSTAHL WITTEN-KREEFELD GMBH: "Thyrofort - Heat-treatable steels", 2000, pages 3 - 79, XP055476447
  • ASTM INTERNATIONAL: "Standard Specification for High Hardenability Antifriction Bearing Steel", ASTM-NORM A485-03, 2003, pages 1 - 4, XP055476454, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.astm.org/DATABASE.CART/HISTORICAL/A485-03.htm>
  • C.W. WEGST: "Stahlschlüssel", 1998, VERLAG STAHLSCHLÜSSEL WEGST GMBH, pages: 1pp, 35, 36, XP055476458
  • OSCAR ZWIRLEIN, WALTER P. WIELAND: "Case Depth for Induction Hardened Slewing Bearing Rings", INTERNATIONAL OFF-HIGHWAY MEETING & EXPOSITION /SEA TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES 831371/, 12 September 1983 (1983-09-12) - 15 September 1983 (1983-09-15), pages 17pp, XP055476463
  • H. SCHLICHT ET AL.: "Ermüdung bei Wälzlagern und deren Beeinflussung durch Werkstoffeigenschaften", FAG WÄLZLAGERTECHNIK, January 1987 (1987-01-01), pages 14 - 22, XP055476470
  • 0. ZWIRLEIN AND H. SCHLICHT: "Rolling Contact Fatigue Testing of Bearing Steels", 1982, ASTM INTERNATIONAL, article "Rolling Contact Fatigue Mechanisms - Accelerated Testing Versus Field Performance", pages: 358 - 379, XP055476475

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2010127860 A1 20101111; CN 102803768 A 20121128; CN 102803768 B 20160629; DK 2427666 T3 20171016; EP 2427666 A1 20120314; EP 2427666 B1 20170712; EP 3228889 A1 20171011; ES 2638368 T3 20171020; JP 2012526247 A 20121025; JP 2015232396 A 20151224; JP 6195874 B2 20170913; US 2012134616 A1 20120531; US 9284983 B2 20160315

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20180411

2018-05-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 2427666 P

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR