Global Patent Index - EP 3229929 A1

EP 3229929 A1 2017-10-18 - PACK WHICH CAN BE CONVERTED INTO A FRAME

Title (en)

PACK WHICH CAN BE CONVERTED INTO A FRAME

Title (de)

IN EINEN RAHMEN UMWANDELBARE VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUVANT ÊTRE TRANSFORMÉ EN UN CADRE

Publication

EP 3229929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 16723323 A

Priority

  • DE 202015104136 U
  • EP 2016060469 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2017025209A1] The invention relates to a pack (10) which can be converted into a frame, comprising: a flat rectangular carrier plate (11) which comprises a front surface (70) and a rear surface (72), a rectangular frame element (19), which has an outer wall (40) arranged on the outer periphery thereof and having a bottom and a top edge (43, 44), and a top wall (42) of the frame element (19), which top wall borders on the top edge (44) on the inside of the frame element (19), and a rectangular cover element (60). The carrier plate (11), the frame element (19) and the cover element (60) are designed and can be arranged with respect to each other such that, in the packaging state, the carrier plate (11) can be encompassed by at least the bottom edge (43) of the outer wall (40) of the frame element (19) and a cover element (50) is arranged on the top wall (42) of the frame element (19) parallel to the carrier plate (11) such that a pack is formed in the form of a parallelepiped. The carrier plate (11) and at least the cover element (60) form the top and the bottom side of the pack (10), and the outer wall (40) of the frame element (19) forms the side walls of the pack. In the frame state, the frame element (19) is arranged on the front surface (70) of the carrier plate (11) along the periphery thereof, and the cover element (60) is either arranged on the rear surface (72) of the carrier plate (11) or between the front surface (70) of the carrier plate (11) and the frame element (19).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/1044 (2013.01); A63F 3/0023 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00946 (2013.01); A63F 2009/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 202015104136 U1 20150907; EP 3229929 A1 20171018; EP 3229929 B1 20180314; ES 2664857 T3 20180423; PL 3229929 T3 20180731; WO 2017025209 A1 20170216

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-05-30 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 3

2018-04-23 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2664857 T3

- Effective date: 20180423

2018-04-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502016000722

2018-04-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-03-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI AND CO. S.A., CH

2018-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 978284 T

- Effective date: 20180315

2018-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-03-14 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-11-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171010

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 3/00 20060101AFI20170920BHEP

2017-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/10 20060101ALI20170920BHEP

2017-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170713

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-09-20 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502016000722

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A63F0009100000

- IPC: A63F0003000000