Global Patent Index - EP 3230670 A2

EP 3230670 A2 2017-10-18 - HEAT RADIATOR

Title (en)

HEAT RADIATOR

Title (de)

WÄRMESTRAHLER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RAYONNEMENT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 3230670 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 16756571 A

Priority

  • DE 102015112163 A
  • DE 202015103908 U
  • DE 202015104280 U
  • DE 2016100334 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2017016546A2] When a body is irradiated for the purpose of drying, a convection current is produced between the heat radiator and the body to be dried. Said air current carries away the humidity discharged from the body but can also cool off the body and the heat radiator when too close. The invention provides a marginal sealing of the intermediate space between the body and the heat radiator, marginal zones of a sealing strip preventing the air current and an air-permeable central zone allowing the air current. In this way, the air can be carried off in as precise a manner as possible between the body to be dried and the heat radiator and has as little effect on these as possible.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/28 (2006.01); E04B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/283 (2013.01); E04B 1/7007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2017016546A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

WO 2017016546 A2 20170202; WO 2017016546 A3 20170511; WO 2017016546 A4 20170629; CN 107923704 A 20180417; EP 3230670 A2 20171018; EP 3230670 B1 20180502; PL 3230670 T3 20180928

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-08-15 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-08-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 3

2018-05-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502016000975

2018-05-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-05-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502016000975

2018-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 995722 T

- Effective date: 20180515

2018-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-04-18 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-01-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171218

2017-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170712

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME