Global Patent Index - EP 3231332 A1

EP 3231332 A1 2017-10-18 - VERTICAL ANTI-SNATCHING STAND FOR HOLDING HANDBAGS

Title (en)

VERTICAL ANTI-SNATCHING STAND FOR HOLDING HANDBAGS

Title (de)

VERTIKALER WEGREISSSCHUTZSTAND ZUM HALTEN VON HANDTASCHEN

Title (fr)

SUPPORT VERTICAL ANTIVOL À L'ARRACHÉ POUR TENIR DES SACS À MAIN

Publication

EP 3231332 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 17150800 A

Priority

ES 201600302 A

Abstract (en)

A vertical anti-snatching stand for holding handbags, which is structured into a main body formed by a slotted base (27) and a shaft (1) with two hooks (2a) and (2b) which are arranged at different heights and on the same plane, hooks which incorporate an anti-snatching safety locking system that has a fastener (3) that is articulated to the tip at the end of each of the hooks (2a) and (2b) by a spring bolt (4) for theft deterrence. The design of the invention facilitates, through the slot (26) of its base (27), the stacking of several units on said bases (27) to optimize space while it is not being used. The invention has two inventions that can be coupled: an elastic-mesh-type bag (12) to hold all handbags without a handle and a stand-alone box (14) to recharge electronic terminals.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/04 (2006.01); A47B 87/02 (2006.01); A47F 7/19 (2006.01); A47G 25/06 (2006.01); A47B 91/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/19 (2013.01); A47B 87/02 (2013.01); A47F 5/04 (2013.01); A47G 25/0664 (2013.01); A47B 91/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3231332 A1 20171018; EP 3231332 B1 20180328; ES 2637976 A1 20171018

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602017000024

2018-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 982600 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-03-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-03-28 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA

- Effective date: 20171116

2018-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2018-01-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47F 5/04 20060101AFI20171128BHEP

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 87/02 20060101ALI20171128BHEP

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47G 25/06 20060101ALI20171128BHEP

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47B 91/00 20060101ALN20171128BHEP

2018-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47F 7/19 20060101ALI20171128BHEP

2017-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20171116

2017-12-27 [RAV] REQUESTED VALIDATION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Countries: MA MD

- Effective date: 20171116

2017-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-18 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME