Global Patent Index - EP 3233287 A1

EP 3233287 A1 2017-10-25 - CRUSHING APPARATUS

Title (en)

CRUSHING APPARATUS

Title (de)

BRECHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONCASSAGE

Publication

EP 3233287 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 15810671 A

Priority

  • DE 102014018785 A
  • EP 2015080168 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2016097110A1] The invention relates to a crushing device (10) for crushing material to be crushed, comprising a housing (12), at least one crushing roller (30), at least one bearing (20) for bearing the crushing roller (30), and at least one substantially sleeve-shaped receiving device (16) arranged between the housing (12) and the bearing (20) in such a way that the receiving device (16) can rotate about its central axis (M2) relative to the housing (12), wherein the bearing (20) is eccentrically mounted in the receiving device (16), such that, via a rotation of the receiving device (16), the bearing (20) moves relative to the housing (12), wherein the crushing device (10) has a pre-tensioning element (38) that is arranged in such a way that it applies the receiving device (16; 36; 56) against the housing (12; 52) with a pre-tensioning force.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/02 (2006.01); B02C 4/08 (2006.01); B02C 4/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/32 (2013.01); B02C 4/02 (2013.01); B02C 4/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 102014018785 A1 20160623; CN 107107064 A 20170829; EP 3233287 A1 20171025; EP 3233287 B1 20180912; WO 2016097110 A1 20160623

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1039909 T

- Effective date: 20181015

2018-10-04 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502015005899

2018-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG

2018-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP AG

2018-06-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180518

2018-03-28 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180215

2017-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170614

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME