Global Patent Index - EP 3233382 A1

EP 3233382 A1 2017-10-25 - POWER TOOL

Title (en)

POWER TOOL

Title (de)

HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL PORTABLE

Publication

EP 3233382 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 15817157 A

Priority

  • EP 14198722 A
  • EP 2015079698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2016096791A1] The power tool has a tool holder (2) for holding a chiselling tool on a working axis (11), a motor (5), and a pneumatic percussion mechanism (6) driven by the motor (5). The percussion mechanism (6) has a percussion element (14) guided on the working axis (11) and provided with a percussion surface (23) pointing in the percussion direction (12), an exciter piston (13) driven by the motor (5), and a pneumatic chamber (18) formed between the exciter piston (13) and the percussion element (14) for coupling the percussion element (14) to the movement of the exciter piston (13). The percussion element (14) has a first partial body (35) forming the percussion surface (23), a second partial body (34), and a spring element (33). The first partial body (35) is moveable along the working axis (11) relative to the second partial body (35). The second partial body (34) has an abutment surface (37) pointing in the percussion direction (12). The first partial body (35) has an impact surface (36) opposite the abutment surface (37) for receiving an impact of the second partial body (34) on the first partial body (35). The spring element (33) drives the first partial body (35) relative to the second partial body (34) in the percussion direction (12) into a starting position, in which the abutment surface (37) is separated from the impact surface (36) by a gap (32).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/12 (2006.01); B25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/06 (2013.01); B25D 11/125 (2013.01); B25D 17/02 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0023 (2013.01); B25D 2250/181 (2013.01); B25D 2250/265 (2013.01); B25D 2250/345 (2013.01); B25D 2250/371 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3034242 A1 20160622; CN 107107321 A 20170829; EP 3233382 A1 20171025; EP 3233382 B1 20180815; US 2018264636 A1 20180920; WO 2016096791 A1 20160623

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502015005515

2018-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1029219 T

- Effective date: 20180815

2018-06-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180511

2018-03-28 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170718

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME