Global Patent Index - EP 3233622 A1

EP 3233622 A1 2017-10-25 - SHIPPING DEVICE FOR LIQUID BULK PRODUCTS

Title (en)

SHIPPING DEVICE FOR LIQUID BULK PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERSANDVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLÜSSIGES SCHÜTTGUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT MARITIME POUR DU VRAC LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 3233622 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 15808768 A

Priority

  • FR 1462838 A
  • FR 2015053261 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2016097519A1] The invention relates to a shipping device for liquid bulk products (14) in at least one hold (13), open at the top thereof, of a cargo ship (12) including vessels (5) arranged in said hold (13) and capable of receiving the liquid bulk product (14); according to the invention, the device includes at least one removable partition (6) capable of dividing the at least one hold (13) into at least two receptacles (131), and said vessels (5) are tanks (51) with flexible walls, which can be positioned and occupy the entire volume of each receptacle (131), the lower and peripheral walls (51) of said flexible tanks (5) being capable of resting against the bottom (31) and side peripheral (32) walls of the hold (13) as well as against those of the at least one removable partition (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/34 (2006.01); B63B 25/02 (2006.01); B63B 25/08 (2006.01); B63B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/34 (2013.01); B63B 25/08 (2013.01); B63B 2025/022 (2013.01); B63B 2025/025 (2013.01); B63B 2025/085 (2013.01); B63B 2025/087 (2013.01); B63B 2035/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

WO 2016097519 A1 20160623; EP 3233622 A1 20171025; EP 3233622 B1 20180926; FR 3030438 A1 20160624; FR 3030438 B1 20170113

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602015017244

2018-10-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2018-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1045673 T

- Effective date: 20181015

2018-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-09-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-08-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180723

2018-08-15 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2018-07-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180608

2018-03-28 [DAV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2018-03-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2017-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME