Global Patent Index - EP 3235917 A1

EP 3235917 A1 2017-10-25 - ALLOY FOR PRESSURE DIE CASTING

Title (en)

ALLOY FOR PRESSURE DIE CASTING

Title (de)

DRUCKGUSSLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR MOULAGE SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 3235917 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 16165969 A

Priority

EP 16165969 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2017182102A1] The invention relates to a die casting alloy on an aluminum-silicon base with a composition consisting of: 8.5 to 11.5 wt.% of silicon; 0.1 to 0.5 wt.% of magnesium; 0.3 to 0.8 wt.% of manganese; 0.02 to 0.5 wt.% of iron; 0.005 to 0.5 wt.% of zinc; 0.02 to 0.3 wt.% of molybdenum; 0.1 to 0.5 wt.% of copper; 0.02 to 0.15 wt.% of titanium; 0.02 to 0.3 wt.% of zirconium, 5 to 250 ppm of phosphorus, 10 to 200 ppm of gallium and the remainder of aluminum and unavoidable impurities. The alloy can be produced with a recycling rate of 50 %.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Druckgusslegierung auf Aluminium-Silizium Basis mit einer Zusammensetzung bestehend aus: 8,5 bis 11,5 Gew.-% Silizium; 0,1 bis 0,5 Gew.-% Magnesium; 0,3 bis 0,8 Gew.-% Mangan; 0,02 - 0,5 Gew.-% Eisen; 0,005 - 0,5 Gew.-% Zink; 0,02 bis 0,3 Gew.-% Molybdän; 0,1 bis 0,5 Gew.-% Kupfer; 0,02 bis 0,15 Gew.-% Titan; 0,02 bis 0.3 Gew-.% Zirkon, 5 bis 250 ppm Phosphor, 10 bis 200 ppm Gallium und der Rest Aluminium und unvermeidbare Verunreinigungen. Die Legierung ist mit einem Recyclinganteil von 50 % herstellbar.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 3235917 A1 20171025; EP 3235917 B1 20180815; WO 2017182102 A1 20171026

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-29 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20180815

2018-09-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502016001649

2018-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-08-24 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1245356

2018-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2018-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1029843 T

- Effective date: 20180815

2018-05-23 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180426

2017-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20171114

2017-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-25 [AV] REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT IN:

- Countries: MA MD

2017-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME