EP 3251183 A4 20190109 - OPTICAL LATTICE CLOCK AT OPERATIONAL MAGIC FREQUENCY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
Title (en)
OPTICAL LATTICE CLOCK AT OPERATIONAL MAGIC FREQUENCY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME
Title (de)
UHR MIT EINEM OPTISCHEN GITTER BEI MAGISCHER BETRIEBSFREQUENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON
Title (fr)
HORLOGE À RÉSEAU OPTIQUE À FRÉQUENCE MAGIQUE DE FONCTIONNEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2015016480 A 20150130
- JP 2016053599 W 20160128
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2016122001A1] In an embodiment an optical lattice clock (100) comprising atoms (2) and a laser light source (4) at an operational magic frequency is provided. The atoms are capable of making a clock transition between two levels of electronic states, and the laser light source generates at least a pair of counterpropagating laser beams, each of which having a lattice- laser intensity I. The pair of counterpropagating laser beams forms an optical lattice potential for trapping the atoms at around antinodes of a standing wave created by it. The operational magic frequency is one of frequencies that have an effect of making lattice- induced clock shift of the clock transition insensitive to variation ΔI of the lattice-laser intensity I, the lattice-induced clock shift being a shift in a frequency for the clock transition of the atoms caused by the variation ΔI of the lattice-laser intensity / due to AC Stark effect on the two levels of the electronic states.
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] WO 2014027637 A1 20140220 - RIKEN [JP]
- [AD] V. D. OVSIANNIKOV ET AL: "Multipole, nonlinear, and anharmonic uncertainties of clocks of Sr atoms in an optical lattice", PHYSICAL REVIEW A (ATOMIC, MOLECULAR, AND OPTICAL PHYSICS), vol. 88, no. 1, 1 July 2013 (2013-07-01), USA, XP055530402, ISSN: 1050-2947, DOI: 10.1103/PhysRevA.88.013405
- [A] ANDREI DEREVIANKO ET AL: "Colloquium : Physics of optical lattice clocks", REVIEWS OF MODERN PHYSICS, vol. 83, no. 2, 1 April 2011 (2011-04-01), pages 331 - 347, XP055199491, ISSN: 0034-6861, DOI: 10.1103/RevModPhys.83.331
- [A] AFFOLDERBACH C ET AL: "Light-shift suppression in laser optically pumped vapour-cell atomic frequency standards", APPLIED PHYSICS B ; LASERS AND OPTICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 80, no. 7, 1 June 2005 (2005-06-01), pages 841 - 848, XP019337396, ISSN: 1432-0649, DOI: 10.1007/S00340-005-1804-7
- [A] ANDREW D. LUDLOW ET AL: "Systematic Study of the 87Sr Clock Transition in an optical lattice", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, vol. 96, no. 3, 27 January 2006 (2006-01-27), US, XP055530563, ISSN: 0031-9007, DOI: 10.1103/PhysRevLett.96.033003
- See references of WO 2016122001A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2016122001 A1 20160804; EP 3251183 A1 20171206; EP 3251183 A4 20190109; EP 3251183 B1 20200318; JP 2018510494 A 20180412; JP 6635608 B2 20200129; US 10452029 B2 20191022; US 2018011449 A1 20180111
DOCDB simple family (application)
JP 2016053599 W 20160128; EP 16743604 A 20160128; JP 2017538753 A 20160128; US 201615547481 A 20160128