EP 3263795 B1 20190515 - COMPOSITE STRUCTURAL WALL AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF
Title (en)
COMPOSITE STRUCTURAL WALL AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF
Title (de)
VERBUNDSTRUKTURWAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION DAVON
Title (fr)
PAROI STRUCTURELLE COMPOSITE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION
Publication
Application
Priority
- SG 10201605306W A 20160628
- SG 10201703972W A 20170515
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP3263795A1] The present invention relates to pre-cast wall panels and methods to join the wall panels to construct composite structural walls. The wall panel comprises a panel body, at least one guide protruding from at least one groove formed in the panel body. The composite wall is constructed by arranging a first wall panel adjacent to a second wall panel, wherein the at least one guide of the first and second wall panel are overlapped to form a channel; inserting a linking rod into the channel; dispensing grout into a gap between the first and the second wall panel; and curing the grout to join the first and the second wall panel to form the composite structural wall. The wall panel may be part of a prefabricated construction module.
IPC 8 full level
E04B 2/86 (2006.01); E04B 1/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04G 21/14 (2006.01)
CPC (source: CN EP)
E04B 1/348 (2013.01 - CN); E04B 1/34823 (2013.01 - CN EP); E04B 1/61 (2013.01 - CN); E04B 2/00 (2013.01 - CN); E04B 2/8617 (2013.01 - EP); E04B 9/00 (2013.01 - CN); E04B 1/046 (2013.01 - EP); E04G 21/142 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (examination)
FR 2670523 A1 19920619 - MAISON BLEUE SA [FR]
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Integrated Precast
- WO 2006131396 A1 20061214 - D L C S R L [IT], et al
- WO 2012175802 A1 20121227 - PEIKKO GROUP OY [FI], et al
- EP 1471192 B1 20161109 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- WO 03008737 A2 20030130 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- DE 202006007316 U1 20070906 - BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF METALL [DE]
- US 3394522 A 19680730 - FRITZ MAURER
- CN 101208489 A 20080625 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- DE 102006057134 A1 20080605 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- DE 865652 C 19530202 - BOEYNG HERMANN JOSEF
- FR 1448310 A 19660805
- US 3550334 A 19701229 - LELY CORNELIS VAN DER
- US 3564795 A 19710223 - HENTON JESSE VERNON
- US 3710534 A 19730116 - MC NAMARA J
- US 4136492 A 19790130 - WILLINGHAM JOHN H
- US 6658799 B1 20031209 - STOODLEY WILLIAM RICHARD CHARL [GB]
- US 2014341654 A1 20141120 - MAY JUSTIN IVAN [US], et al
- WO 0190499 A1 20011129 - SCALLAN L JOE [US], et al
- US 1240492 A 19170918 - SAWYER FRANK MCMURRAY [US]
- US 4696698 A 19870929 - HARRIETT TODD D [US]
- US 4211043 A 19800708 - CODAY JERRY F [US]
- US 3812637 A 19740528 - QUESADA J, et al
- US 3772835 A 19731120 - COX E, et al
- JP 2017031721 A 20170209 - ASAHI TOSTEM GAISO KK
- US 3890748 A 19750624 - FENCL MIROSLAV
- KR 101389203 B1 20140424 - CITY STRUCTURAL SAFETY ENGINEERS CO LTD [KR], et al
- WO 9102862 A1 19910307 - AUSDAL THORLEIF [NO]
- FR 2829778 A1 20030321 - VIGON EDDIE [FR]
- DE 10046138 A1 20020411 - GLATTHAAR FERTIGKELLER AG BERI [CH]
- GB 2420126 A 20060517 - LAING O ROURKE GROUP SERVICES [GB]
- JP 2013117104 A 20130613 - TAISEI ULEC KK, et al
- JP H09203143 A 19970805 - TOKYU KOKEN KK
- JP H07166601 A 19950627 - TAISEI CORP
- EP 2224075 A2 20100901 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- AU 2008280579 B2 20140109 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- DE 19835900 A1 19990311 - WOCHNER MARTIN DIPL ING [DE]
- KR 101776129 B1 20170907 - KIM TAE KYUN [KR]
- US 2019169844 A1 20190606 - YOUSEFI DARESTANI ARIO [AU]
- NZ 264597 A 19970129 - ENGINEERING CERTIFIERS LTD SUB
- JP S537911 B2 19780323
- ANONYMOUS: "Symmetrical economical prefabricated part connections; prepare to be thrilled …", PFEIFER, 1 May 2015 (2015-05-01), pages 1 - 32, XP055743138, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.pfeifer.info/out/assets/PFEIFER_VS-SYSTEM-APPROVED_PPEN.PDF> [retrieved on 20201023]
- ANONYMOUS: "Eurocode 2: Design of concrete structures - Part 1-1 : General rules and rules for buildings", EUROPEAN STANDARD EN 1992-1-1, 1 December 2004 (2004-12-01), pages 1 - 227
Opponent : Integrated Precast Solutions PTE LTD
- WO 2006131396 A1 20061214 - D L C S R L [IT], et al
- WO 2012175802 A1 20121227 - PEIKKO GROUP OY [FI], et al
- EP 1471192 B1 20161109 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- WO 03008737 A2 20030130 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- DE 202006007316 U1 20070906 - BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF METALL [DE]
- US 3394522 A 19680730 - FRITZ MAURER
- CN 101208489 A 20080625 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- DE 102006057134 A1 20080605 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- DE 865652 C 19530202 - BOEYNG HERMANN JOSEF
- FR 1448310 A 19660805
- US 3550334 A 19701229 - LELY CORNELIS VAN DER
- US 3564795 A 19710223 - HENTON JESSE VERNON
- US 3710534 A 19730116 - MC NAMARA J
- US 4136492 A 19790130 - WILLINGHAM JOHN H
- US 6658799 B1 20031209 - STOODLEY WILLIAM RICHARD CHARL [GB]
- US 2014341654 A1 20141120 - MAY JUSTIN IVAN [US], et al
- WO 0190499 A1 20011129 - SCALLAN L JOE [US], et al
- US 1240492 A 19170918 - SAWYER FRANK MCMURRAY [US]
- US 4696698 A 19870929 - HARRIETT TODD D [US]
- US 4211043 A 19800708 - CODAY JERRY F [US]
- US 3812637 A 19740528 - QUESADA J, et al
- US 3772835 A 19731120 - COX E, et al
- JP 2017031721 A 20170209 - ASAHI TOSTEM GAISO KK
- US 3890748 A 19750624 - FENCL MIROSLAV
- KR 101389203 B1 20140424 - CITY STRUCTURAL SAFETY ENGINEERS CO LTD [KR], et al
- WO 9102862 A1 19910307 - AUSDAL THORLEIF [NO]
- FR 2829778 A1 20030321 - VIGON EDDIE [FR]
- DE 10046138 A1 20020411 - GLATTHAAR FERTIGKELLER AG BERI [CH]
- GB 2410126 A 20050720 - DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]
- JP 2013117104 A 20130613 - TAISEI ULEC KK, et al
- JP H09203143 A 19970805 - TOKYU KOKEN KK
- JP H07166601 A 19950627 - TAISEI CORP
- EP 2224075 A2 20100901 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- AU 2008280579 B2 20140109 - PHILIPP GMBH [DE]
- DE 19835900 A1 19990311 - WOCHNER MARTIN DIPL ING [DE]
- KR 101776129 B1 20170907 - KIM TAE KYUN [KR]
- US 2019169844 A1 20190606 - YOUSEFI DARESTANI ARIO [AU]
- NZ 264597 A 19970129 - ENGINEERING CERTIFIERS LTD SUB
- JP S537911 A 19780124 - DAISUE KENSETSU KK
- ANONYMUS: "Symmetrical economical prefabricated part connections", PFEIFER SEIL- UND HEBETECHNIK GMBH, 1 May 2015 (2015-05-01), XP055690596
- EUROCODE 2: DESIGN OF CONCRETE STRUCTURES, PART 1-1 GENERAL RULES AND RULES FOR BUILDINGS, XP055674836
Opponent : Mr. LIN, Sihe
- US 4107886 A 19780822 - RAY ORLANDO F, et al
- DE 20319471 U1 20050120 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- DE 202008017065 U1 20100512 - PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]
- US 5440845 A 19950815 - TADROS MAHER K [US], et al
- US 6070380 A 20000606 - MEILLEUR SERGE [CA]
- US 7681368 B1 20100323 - RUBIO EDWARD [US]
- "Simple, robust, fast - the complete wall connecting system", PFEIFER VS@ WIRE ROPE LOOP SYSTEM BROCHURE, October 2007 (2007-10-01), pages 1 - 22, XP055715976
- BROOKER ET AL.: "Residential Cellular Concrete Buildings - A guide for the design and specification of concrete buildings using tunnel form, crosswall or twinwall systems", THE CONCRETE CENTER BROCHURE, September 2008 (2008-09-01), pages 1 - 70, XP055715993
- WHITTLE ET AL.: "Design of Hybrid Concrete Buildings - A guide to the design of buildings combining in-situ and precast concrete", THE CONCRETE CENTER BROCHURE, January 2009 (2009-01-01), pages 1 - 116, XP055715999
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3263795 A1 20180103; EP 3263795 B1 20190515; CN 107542190 A 20180105; CN 107542190 B 20200501; CN 111622374 A 20200904; CN 111622374 B 20220412; DK 3263795 T3 20190617; ES 2733309 T3 20191128; HK 1244857 B 20200117; HK 1244858 A1 20180817; MY 190080 A 20220325; PL 3263795 T3 20191031; PT 3263795 T 20190725; SG 10201703972W A 20180130; SG 10201908614W A 20191030; SG 10202107902R A 20210929
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 17175623 A 20170613; CN 201710511556 A 20170628; CN 202010263656 A 20170628; DK 17175623 T 20170613; ES 17175623 T 20170613; HK 18104091 A 20180323; HK 18104092 A 20180323; MY PI2017702193 A 20170614; PL 17175623 T 20170613; PT 17175623 T 20170613; SG 10201703972W A 20170515; SG 10201908614W A 20170515; SG 10202107902R A 20170515