Global Patent Index - EP 3285167 A1

EP 3285167 A1 20180221 - CENTRAL PROCESSING UNIT RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD AND COMPUTING NODE

Title (en)

CENTRAL PROCESSING UNIT RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD AND COMPUTING NODE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG FÜR ZENTRALE VERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT UND COMPUTING-KNOTEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'ALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES D'UNITÉ CENTRALE DE TRAITEMENT ET NOEUD DE CALCUL

Publication

EP 3285167 A1 20180221 (EN)

Application

EP 17162956 A 20120831

Priority

  • EP 17162956 A 20120831
  • EP 12883650 A 20120831
  • CN 2012080872 W 20120831

Abstract (en)

Embodiments of the present invention relate to a central processing unit resource allocation method and a computing node. The method includes: adjusting dynamically, according to a change in the number of virtual machines in an advanced resource pool, the number of allocated physical cores in the advanced resource pool; and adjusting, according to the number of the allocated physical cores in the advanced resource pool, the number of allocated physical cores in a default resource pool, where the advanced resource pool and the default resource pool are resource pools that are obtained by dividing physical cores of a central processing unit according to service levels of the resource pools. According to the embodiments of the present invention, physical cores are divided into different resource pools, and computing resources of physical cores in one resource pool are isolated from those in another resource pool, thereby implementing effective allocation of physical core computing resources for different application scenarios.

IPC 8 full level

G06F 9/50 (2006.01); G06F 9/455 (2018.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

G06F 9/45533 (2013.01 - US); G06F 9/5027 (2013.01 - US); G06F 9/5077 (2013.01 - EP US); G06F 2209/5011 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [A] CN 101706743 A 20100512 - UNIV BEIHANG
  • [A] WO 2012032679 A1 20120315 - HITACHI LTD [JP], et al & US 2013160014 A1 20130620 - WATANABE KENTARO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 2011202925 A1 20110818 - BANERJEE PRADIPTA KUMAR [IN], et al
  • [A] US 2008028409 A1 20080131 - CHERKASOVA LUDMILA [US], et al
  • [A] US 2010125855 A1 20100520 - FERWERDA PAUL [US], et al
  • [A] GMACH D ET AL: "Resource pool management: Reactive versus proactive or let's be friends", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 53, no. 17, 3 December 2009 (2009-12-03), pages 2905 - 2922, XP026765085, ISSN: 1389-1286, [retrieved on 20090820], DOI: 10.1016/J.COMNET.2009.08.011
  • [A] DANIEL GMACH ET AL: "Satisfying Service Level Objectices in a Self-Managing Resource Pool", SELF-ADAPTIVE AND SELF-ORGANIZING SYSTEMS, 2009. SASO '09. THIRD IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 14 September 2009 (2009-09-14), pages 243 - 253, XP031552229, ISBN: 978-1-4244-4890-6
  • [A] QIANG LI ET AL: "Adaptive Management of Virtualized Resources in Cloud Computing Using Feedback Control", 2009 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING (ICISE 2009) - 26-28 DEC. 2009 - NANJING, CHINA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 26 December 2009 (2009-12-26), pages 99 - 102, XP031662428, ISBN: 978-1-4244-4909-5

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

US 10007558 B2 20180626; US 2015040131 A1 20150205; CN 103180830 A 20130626; CN 103180830 B 20161012; EP 2863304 A1 20150422; EP 2863304 A4 20150708; EP 2863304 B1 20171011; EP 3285167 A1 20180221; EP 3285167 B1 20190102; EP 3296871 A1 20180321; EP 3296871 B1 20190109; JP 2015524976 A 20150827; JP 6159402 B2 20170705; US 10810045 B2 20201020; US 2018267837 A1 20180920; WO 2014032287 A1 20140306

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 201414516936 A 20141017; CN 2012080872 W 20120831; CN 201280002398 A 20120831; EP 12883650 A 20120831; EP 17162956 A 20120831; EP 17170553 A 20120831; JP 2015526852 A 20120831; US 201815988198 A 20180524