EP 3288292 A1 20180228 - HEARING AID USING WIRELESS TEST MODES AS DIAGNOSTIC TOOL
Title (en)
HEARING AID USING WIRELESS TEST MODES AS DIAGNOSTIC TOOL
Title (de)
HÖRHILFE MIT DRAHTLOSEN PRÜFMODALITÄTEN ALS DIAGNOSEWERKZEUG
Title (fr)
PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE À L'AIDE DE MODES D'ESSAI SANS FIL COMME OUTIL DE DIAGNOSTIC
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201313843725 A 20130315
- EP 14159982 A 20140314
Abstract (en)
Various system embodiments comprise a plurality of devices configured to wirelessly communicate with each other. The plurality of devices includes a battery-operated hearing aid configured to communicate with another device using Bluetooth Low Energy (BLE) wireless communication technology. A BLE tester is configured to test the hearing aid for the performance of BLE wireless communication via a wireless link. One embodiment uses a wireless test mode as a diagnostic tool for analyzing the wireless communication environment, such as when the communication with the hearing aid is interfered in a noisy environment.
IPC 8 full level
H04R 25/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H04R 25/30 (2013.01 - EP US); H04R 25/305 (2013.01 - EP US); H04R 25/554 (2013.01 - EP US); H04R 2460/05 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 201313843852 A 20130315
- US 201361801152 P 20130315
- US 2006274747 A1 20061207 - DUCHSCHER ROB [US], et al
- US 61954107 A 20070103
- US 2007110193 A1 20070517 - SOLUM JEFFREY P [US]
Citation (search report)
- [Y] WO 2009063097 A2 20090522 - PHONAK AG [CH], et al
- [Y] US 2010054512 A1 20100304 - SOLUM JEFFREY PAUL [US]
- [A] EL-BENDARY M A M ET AL: "Bluetooth performance improvement over different channels through channel coding", SYSTEMS, SIGNALS AND DEVICES, 2008. IEEE SSD 2008. 5TH INTERNATIONAL MULTI-CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 20 July 2008 (2008-07-20), pages 1 - 5, XP031395767, ISBN: 978-1-4244-2205-0
- [AP] "BPA 600 Dual Mode Bluetooth Protocol Analyzer User Manual", 11 February 2015 (2015-02-11), XP055226518, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.fte.com/docs/usermanuals/usermanualbpa600.pdf> [retrieved on 20151106]
- [AP] "Frontline Announces the ComProbe BPA 600 Dual Mode Bluetooth Protocol Analyzer", 28 November 2013 (2013-11-28), XP055226529, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.fte.com/docs/PressReleases/Press Release - ComProbe BPA 600 Analyzer Introduced.pdf> [retrieved on 20151106]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2779700 A1 20140917; EP 3288292 A1 20180228; EP 3288292 B1 20200819
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 14159982 A 20140314; EP 17173806 A 20140314