EP 3300709 A1 20180404 - A METHOD OF SECURING A PATIENT ONTO AN OPERATING TABLE WHEN THE PATIENT IS IN THE TRENDELENBURG POSITION AND APPARATUS THEREFOR INCLUDING A KIT
Title (en)
A METHOD OF SECURING A PATIENT ONTO AN OPERATING TABLE WHEN THE PATIENT IS IN THE TRENDELENBURG POSITION AND APPARATUS THEREFOR INCLUDING A KIT
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES PATIENTEN IN DER TRENDELENBURG-LAGE AUF EINEM OPERATIONSTISCH UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR EINSCHLIESSLICH EINES KITS
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN PATIENT SUR UNE TABLE D'OPÉRATION LORSQUE LE PATIENT EST EN POSITION DE TRENDELENBURG, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ COMPRENANT UN KIT
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201213346852 A 20120110
- EP 13735915 A 20130109
Abstract (en)
A method of securing a patient onto an operating table when the patient is in the Trendelenburg position and apparatus therefor including a kit. A viscoelastic pad is used to support and hold a patient on a medical procedure table during a medical procedure performed while the table, and thus the patient lying thereon, is in an inclined position, such as the Trendelenburg position. The viscoelastic pad has characteristics which promote a minimization of pressure forces on the patient's body, as well as promote a secure cushioning and holding of the patient in a desired position on the table, in order to minimize injury to the patient.
IPC 8 full level
A61G 13/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61G 13/127 (2013.01); A61G 13/1225 (2013.01); A61G 13/123 (2013.01); A61G 2200/327 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
US 8066524 B2 20111129 - BURBANK WILLIAM A [US], et al
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2010212087 A1 20100826 - LEIB ROGER [US], et al
- [A] US 7676862 B2 20100316 - POULOS CRAIG [US], et al
- [A] US 7849540 B2 20101214 - HILL DARRELL G [US]
- [A] US 5784734 A 19980728 - SCOTT GERALD R [US], et al
- [A] US 2009025150 A1 20090129 - SMALLING SCOTT H [US], et al
- [A] US 2008010751 A1 20080117 - KEMPER CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al
- [A] US 2006112490 A1 20060601 - CHAUSSE COLLEEN [US]
- [A] US 2010275377 A1 20101104 - WEST TAMRA [US]
Citation (third parties)
Third party : Matthew Spencer
- EP 2802305 A2 20141119 - PIGAZZI ALESSIO [US], et al
- US 2008016618 A1 20080124 - O'SHEA LOUISE ANN [AU], et al
- US 2010122414 A1 20100520 - SHAH BHARAT [US]
- US 6541094 B1 20030401 - LANDVIK DAG [SE], et al
- US 8051513 B2 20111108 - REED JAIME C [US], et al
- US 8464720 B1 20130618 - PIGAZZI ALESSIO [US], et al
- US 8511314 B2 20130820 - PIGAZZI ALESSIO [US], et al
- US 6922862 B1 20050802 - THOMPSON JIM M [US]
- ANONYMOUS: "Pigazzi Patient Positioning System.(PRODUCT SHOWCASE: PATIENT POSITIONING)", HIGHBEAM RESEARCH, 1 April 2012 (2012-04-01), XP055516298
- ANONYMOUS: "Xodus Medical Pigazzi Patient Positioning System", OR TODAY MAGAZINE, 1 June 2012 (2012-06-01), XP055591959
- XODUS MEDICAL INC: "The Pink Pad", SURGICAL PRODUCTS MAGAZINE, 16 July 2012 (2012-07-16), pages 1 - 3, XP055516296, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.surgicalproductsmag.com/product-release/2012/07/pink-pad>
- XODUS MEDICAL: "Pigazzi Patient Positioning System", XODUS MEDICAL - PRODUCT CALALOG, 15 October 2012 (2012-10-15), XP055591962
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2013106426 A2 20130718; WO 2013106426 A3 20141204; CA 2859398 A1 20130718; CA 2859398 C 20210330; DK 2802305 T3 20180122; EP 2802305 A2 20141119; EP 2802305 A4 20160217; EP 2802305 B1 20171018; EP 3300709 A1 20180404; ES 2654790 T3 20180215; JP 2015506747 A 20150305; JP 2017189642 A 20171019; JP 6863841 B2 20210421; NO 2900900 T3 20180428; PL 2802305 T3 20180330
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2013020824 W 20130109; CA 2859398 A 20130109; DK 13735915 T 20130109; EP 13735915 A 20130109; EP 17196689 A 20130109; ES 13735915 T 20130109; JP 2014552265 A 20130109; JP 2017133009 A 20170706; NO 13840432 A 20130925; PL 13735915 T 20130109