EP 3324990 A4 20190403 - IDENTIFICATION OF IMMUNOGENIC MHC CLASS II PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNE-BASED THERAPY
Title (en)
IDENTIFICATION OF IMMUNOGENIC MHC CLASS II PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNE-BASED THERAPY
Title (de)
IDENTIFIKATION VON IMMUNOGENEN MHC-KLASSE-II-PEPTIDEN FÜR IMMUNBASIERTE THERAPIE
Title (fr)
IDENTIFICATION DE PEPTIDES IMMUNOGÈNES DE CLASSE II DU COMPLEXE MAJEUR D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITÉ POUR UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2016021042 W 20160304
- US 2015041034 W 20150717
- US 2016026542 W 20160407
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2017014816A1] The invention provides compositions, methods, and vaccines that may stimulate the immune system and that may be used for treating malignancies associated with overexpression of the HER3 protein. Such compositions include epitopes of the HER3 protein.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 2/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 38/00 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 39/001106 (2018.08 - EP US); A61K 39/4615 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/4622 (2023.05 - EP); A61K 39/464406 (2023.05 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2018.01 - EP US); C07K 14/71 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 16/32 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 33/56972 (2013.01 - US); G01N 33/57407 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 33/57415 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 33/57492 (2013.01 - US); A61K 2039/5154 (2013.01 - US); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01 - US); A61K 2039/54 (2013.01 - US); A61K 2039/55 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 2039/812 (2018.08 - EP US); A61K 2039/828 (2018.08 - EP US); A61K 2239/57 (2023.05 - EP); G01N 2333/70514 (2013.01 - US); G01N 2333/71 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (search report)
- [IP] WO 2016011343 A1 20160121 - UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al
- [IP] JASHODEEP DATTA ET AL: "Association of Depressed Anti-HER2 T-Helper Type 1 Response With Recurrence in Patients With Completely Treated HER2-Positive Breast Cancer : Role for Immune Monitoring", JAMA ONCOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 2, 1 February 2016 (2016-02-01), US, pages 242, XP055556159, ISSN: 2374-2437, DOI: 10.1001/jamaoncol.2015.5482
- [I] DATTA JASHODEEP ET AL: "Progressive loss of anti-HER2 CD4(+) T-helper type 1 response in breast tumorigenesis and the potential for immune restoration", ONCOIMMUNOLOGY, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, vol. 4, no. 10, 1 April 2015 (2015-04-01), XP002782236, ISSN: 2162-402X, DOI: 10.1080/2162402X.2015.1022301
- [T] FRACOL MEGAN ET AL: "Loss of Anti-HER-3 CD4+ T-Helper Type 1 Immunity Occurs in Breast Tumorigenesis and is Negatively Associated with Outcomes", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 24, no. 2, 23 September 2016 (2016-09-23), pages 407 - 417, XP036125796, ISSN: 1068-9265, [retrieved on 20160923], DOI: 10.1245/S10434-016-5584-6
- See also references of WO 2017014816A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2017014816 A1 20170126; CA 2992925 A1 20170126; CA 2992937 A1 20170126; CN 107206045 A 20170926; EP 3324990 A1 20180530; EP 3324990 A4 20190403; EP 3325005 A1 20180530; EP 3325005 A4 20190327; JP 2018521953 A 20180809; JP 2018527286 A 20180920; JP 2021043204 A 20210318; WO 2017014810 A1 20170126
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2016026542 W 20160407; CA 2992925 A 20160304; CA 2992937 A 20160407; CN 201680002764 A 20160407; EP 16828158 A 20160304; EP 16828163 A 20160407; JP 2017502788 A 20160407; JP 2017502790 A 20160304; JP 2020173500 A 20201014; US 2016021042 W 20160304