Global Patent Index - EP 3333275 B1

EP 3333275 B1 20201111 - STAINLESS STEEL POWDER FOR PRODUCING SINTERED DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL

Title (en)

STAINLESS STEEL POWDER FOR PRODUCING SINTERED DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL

Title (de)

EDELSTAHLPULVER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESINTERTEM DUPLEX-EDELSTAHL

Title (fr)

POUDRE D'ACIER INOXYDABLE POUR PRODUIRE UN ACIER INOXYDABLE DUPLEX FRITTÉ

Publication

EP 3333275 B1 20201111 (EN)

Application

EP 16202574 A 20161207

Priority

EP 16202574 A 20161207

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP3333275A1] Embodiments of the present invention may provide a new stainless steel powder suitable for manufacturing of duplex sintered stainless steels. Embodiments of the present invention may also relate to a method for producing the stainless steel powder, the duplex sintered stainless steel as well as methods for producing the duplex sintered stainless steel.

IPC 8 full level

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/08 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/34 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

B22F 9/082 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 33/0271 (2013.01 - US); C22C 33/0285 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/001 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/002 (2013.01 - EP); C22C 38/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/04 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/08 (2013.01 - US); C22C 38/12 (2013.01 - US); C22C 38/34 (2013.01 - EP); C22C 38/42 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/44 (2013.01 - EP US); B22F 2009/0828 (2013.01 - US); B22F 2301/058 (2013.01 - US); B22F 2301/10 (2013.01 - US); B22F 2301/15 (2013.01 - US); B22F 2304/10 (2013.01 - US)

Citation (examination)

  • DOBRZANSKI L A ET AL: "Properties of vacuum sintered duplex stainless steels", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 162-163, 15 May 2005 (2005-05-15), pages 286 - 292, XP027805857, ISSN: 0924-0136, [retrieved on 20050515]
  • LESZEK ADAM DOBRZANSKI ET AL: "Properties of Vacuum Sintered Duplex Stainless Steels", ADVANCED MATERIALS RESEARCH, vol. 15-17, 1 February 2006 (2006-02-01), pages 828 - 833, XP055616109, DOI: 10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMR.15-17.828
  • L A DOBRZAÑSKI ET AL: "Archives of Materials Science and Engineering Properties of duplex stainless steels made by powder metallurgy", ARCHIVES OF MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, 1 April 2007 (2007-04-01), pages 217 - 223, XP055616115, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.amse.acmsse.h2.pl/vol28_4/2844.pdf> [retrieved on 20190828]
  • OLENA SMUK: "Microstructure and properties of modern P/M super duplex stainless steels", 1 January 2004 (2004-01-01), XP055616116, ISBN: 978-91-7-283761-4, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.diva-portal.org/smash/get/diva2:9607/FULLTEXT01.pdf> [retrieved on 20190828]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 3333275 A1 20180613; EP 3333275 B1 20201111; AU 2017370993 A1 20190620; BR 112019011395 A2 20191015; CA 3046282 A1 20180614; CN 110168122 A 20190823; EP 3551775 A1 20191016; JP 2020509167 A 20200326; KR 20190092493 A 20190807; MX 2019006609 A 20190801; TW 201833346 A 20180916; US 2019309399 A1 20191010; WO 2018104179 A1 20180614

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 16202574 A 20161207; AU 2017370993 A 20171201; BR 112019011395 A 20171201; CA 3046282 A 20171201; CN 201780082430 A 20171201; EP 17808459 A 20171201; EP 2017081234 W 20171201; JP 2019530467 A 20171201; KR 20197019317 A 20171201; MX 2019006609 A 20171201; TW 106142944 A 20171207; US 201716467267 A 20171201