EP 3372700 A1 20180912 - METHOD FOR MAKING FORGED TIAL COMPONENTS
Title (en)
METHOD FOR MAKING FORGED TIAL COMPONENTS
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GESCHMIEDETER TIAL-BAUTEILE
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS STRUCTURAUX EN TIAL FORGÉS
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 17160397 A 20170310
Abstract (en)
[origin: US2018257127A1] A method for producing a forged component from a TiAl alloy is provided, in particular a turbine blade (10), in which method a blank of a TiAl alloy is provided and deformed by forging into a forged, semi-finished part (9). A usable volume is defined within the forged, semi-finished part, the usable volume corresponding to the forged component to be produced. The shape of the blank is selected such that within the usable volume of the forged, semi-finished part, the degree of deformation resulting from forging deviates by no more than ±1 from a defined value.
Abstract (de)
Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geschmiedeten Bauteils aus einer TiAl - Legierung, insbesondere einer Turbinenschaufel (10), bei welchem ein Rohling aus einer TiAl - Legierung bereitgestellt wird und durch Schmieden zu einem geschmiedeten Halbzeug (9) umgeformt wird, wobei in dem geschmiedeten Halbzeug ein nutzbares Volumen definiert ist, welches dem herzustellenden, geschmiedeten Bauteil entspricht, wobei die Form des Rohlings so gewählt wird, dass der Umformgrad innerhalb des nutzbaren Volumens des geschmiedeten Halbzeugs durch das Schmieden einen definierten Wert aufweist, der über das nutzbare Volumen maximal um ± 1 von dem definierten Wert abweicht.
IPC 8 full level
C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B21J 1/06 (2013.01 - US); B21J 5/025 (2013.01 - US); C22C 14/00 (2013.01 - EP US); C22F 1/183 (2013.01 - EP US); F01D 5/147 (2013.01 - US); F01D 5/286 (2013.01 - US); F05D 2220/323 (2013.01 - US); F05D 2230/10 (2013.01 - US); F05D 2230/25 (2013.01 - US); F05D 2230/41 (2013.01 - US); F05D 2300/174 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (applicant)
- DE 102011110740 B4 20170119 - MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]
- DE 102015103422 B3 20160714 - LEISTRITZ TURBINENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]
- EP 2386663 A1 20111116 - BOEHLER SCHMIEDETECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [AT]
Citation (search report)
- [A] BROOKS ET AL: "Three-dimensional finite element modelling of a titanium aluminide aerofoil forging", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNO, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 80-81, 1 August 1998 (1998-08-01), pages 149 - 155, XP005310781, ISSN: 0924-0136, DOI: 10.1016/S0924-0136(98)00103-4
- [A] KIM ET AL: "Microstructural evolution and mechanical properties of a forged gamma titanium aluminide alloy", ACTA METALLURGICA & MATERIALIEN, PERGAMON / ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, vol. 40, no. 6, 1 June 1992 (1992-06-01), pages 1121 - 1134, XP024183449, ISSN: 0956-7151, [retrieved on 19920601], DOI: 10.1016/0956-7151(92)90411-7
- [A] SRINIVASAN R ET AL: "Temperature changes and loads during hot-die forging of a gamma titanium-aluminide alloy", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 160, no. 3, 30 March 2005 (2005-03-30), pages 321 - 334, XP027805712, ISSN: 0924-0136, [retrieved on 20050330]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3372700 A1 20180912; EP 3372700 B1 20191009; ES 2753242 T3 20200407; US 10737314 B2 20200811; US 2018257127 A1 20180913
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 17160397 A 20170310; ES 17160397 T 20170310; US 201815915290 A 20180308