EP 3379932 A4 20190501 - SURFACE DISINFECTANT WITH RESIDUAL BIOCIDAL PROPERTY
Title (en)
SURFACE DISINFECTANT WITH RESIDUAL BIOCIDAL PROPERTY
Title (de)
OBERFLÄCHENDESINFEKTIONSMITTEL MIT VERBLEIBENDEN BIOZIDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN
Title (fr)
DÉSINFECTANT DE SURFACE AYANT UNE PROPRIÉTÉ BIOCIDE RÉSIDUELLE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201514949046 A 20151123
- US 201615162094 A 20160523
- US 2016033891 W 20160524
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2017091251A1] A biofilm sealant is provided imparting a residual biocidal property. The biofilm sealant is used to treat a surface to impart a film having a capacity to quickly kill bacteria and other germs for at least 24 hours after deposit of the film on a treated surface. The disinfectant formulation biofilm sealant comprises a polymer binder, wherein the polymer binder is an oxazoline homopolymer or an extended or a modified polymer based on an oxazoline homopolymer, and a biocidal compound.
IPC 8 full level
C08G 73/00 (2006.01); A01N 25/10 (2006.01); A01N 25/24 (2006.01); A01N 31/02 (2006.01); A01N 33/12 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A01N 33/12 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4481167 A 19841106 - GINTER SALLY P [US], et al
- [X] US 2009087393 A1 20090402 - JENSEN STEVEN D [US], et al
- [X] US 4990339 A 19910205 - SCHOLL STEVEN L [US], et al
- [X] US 5654154 A 19970805 - BRONSTEIN IRENA Y [US], et al
- [X] US 5932253 A 19990803 - TRINH TOAN [US], et al
- [X] CN 102965214 A 20130313 - DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD
- [X] JP H0776113 B2 19950816
- [X] US 6194075 B1 20010227 - SARGEANT STEVEN J [US], et al
- [X] US 2012045583 A1 20120223 - FRENKEL MOSHE [IL], et al
- [X] US 2012183606 A1 20120719 - BENDER JOHANNES CASPAR MATHIAS ELIZABETH [NL], et al
- [X] US 6458906 B1 20021001 - TORGERSON PETER MARTE [US], et al
- [X] US 5183601 A 19930202 - JISAI YASUHIRO [JP], et al
- [Y] WO 2012149591 A1 20121108 - KE KELIT KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [AT], et al
- [X] US 2014170197 A1 20140619 - KABANOV ALEXANDER V [US], et al
- [X] US 6106820 A 20000822 - MORRISSEY CHRISTOPHER TODD [US], et al
- [X] US 5849310 A 19981215 - TRINH TOAN [US], et al
- [Y] US 2007254979 A1 20071101 - SALZ ULRICH [DE], et al
- [Y] US 2015307718 A1 20151029 - COLAK SEMRA [US], et al
- [E] WO 2016086012 A1 20160602 - MICROBAN PRODUCTS [US], et al
- [Y] WASCHINSKI C J ET AL: "Poly(oxazoline)s with Telechelic Antimicrobial Functions", BIOMACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 6, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 235 - 243, XP002405168, ISSN: 1525-7797, DOI: 10.1021/BM049553I
- [XY] RUPERT KONRADI ET AL: "Polyoxazolines for Nonfouling Surface Coatings - A Direct Comparison to the Gold Standard PEG", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 33, no. 19, 15 October 2012 (2012-10-15), pages 1663 - 1676, XP055063066, ISSN: 1022-1336, DOI: 10.1002/marc.201200422
- [Y] FELIX SIEDENBIEDEL ET AL: "Antimicrobial Polymers in Solution and on Surfaces: Overview and Functional Principles", POLYMERS, vol. 4, no. 1, 9 January 2012 (2012-01-09), pages 46 - 71, XP055571526, DOI: 10.3390/polym4010046
- See references of WO 2017091251A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2017091251 A1 20170601; CA 3005601 A1 20170601; CN 108697082 A 20181023; EP 3379932 A1 20181003; EP 3379932 A4 20190501; JP 2018534331 A 20181122; JP 6966438 B2 20211117; MX 2018006391 A 20190214; RU 2018122622 A 20191225; RU 2018122622 A3 20191225
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2016033891 W 20160524; CA 3005601 A 20160524; CN 201680079606 A 20160524; EP 16869007 A 20160524; JP 2018526204 A 20160524; MX 2018006391 A 20160524; RU 2018122622 A 20160524