EP 3382284 B1 20220511 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME
Title (en)
DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME
Title (de)
HAUSHALTSGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HAUSHALTGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF FORMANT APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF FORMANT APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER
Publication
Application
Priority
ES 201730490 A 20170330
Abstract (en)
[origin: ES2684128A1] Domestic appliance device and procedure for the manufacture of a household appliance device. The present invention relates to a domestic appliance device, in particular, to a cooking field device, with at least one shielding plate (20a-b) for electromagnetically shielding at least one electronics. In order to improve the efficiency, it is proposed that at least one section (22a-b) of the shield plate (20a-b) is provided to considerably attenuate at least the regular reflection of the light. (Machine-translation by Google Translate, not legally binding)
IPC 8 full level
F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 6/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP ES)
F24C 7/083 (2013.01 - ES); F24C 15/10 (2013.01 - EP); H05B 6/1218 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (examination)
- JP 2013092361 A 20130516 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP
- DE 102017127624 A1 20190523 - SCHOTT AG [DE]
- EP 2427032 A2 20120307 - BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]
- WO 0141510 A1 20010607 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH - Factory and Development
- EP 2427032 A2 20120307 - BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]
- EP 2288231 A1 20110223 - PANASONIC CORP [JP]
- FR 2827114 A1 20030110 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- "Aluminium Taschenbuch, 16. Auflage", 1 January 2002, ALUMINIUM-VERLAG MARKETING & KOMMUNIKATION GMBH, article KAMMER DR.-ING. C: "Optische Eigenschaften", pages: 272, XP093028493
- ANONYMOUS: "Aluminium", WIKIPEDIA, 22 March 2017 (2017-03-22), pages 1 - 28, XP093028495, [retrieved on 20230302]
- ANONYMOUS: "Rauheitsmessung", WIKIPEDIA, 19 May 2016 (2016-05-19), pages 1 - 2, XP093028500
- ANONYMOUS: "Reflexionsspektroskopie", WIKIPEDIA, 16 March 2016 (2016-03-16), pages 1 - 3, XP093028501
- ANONYMOUS: "Sandstrahlen", WIKIPEDIA, 8 January 2017 (2017-01-08), pages 1 - 4, XP093028503
- ANONYMOUS: "Sand", WIKIPEDIA, 23 February 2017 (2017-02-23), pages 1 - 13, XP093028507
- ANONYMOUS: "SERVICE-HANDBUCH KOCHEN, CRYSTAL-MODUL ALLGEMEINE SERIE", ELECTROLUX DISTRIPARTS, 1 December 2010 (2010-12-01), pages 1 - 41, XP093028512
- ANONYM: "Wikipedia Schleifpapier", WIKIPEDIA, 2 February 2017 (2017-02-02), pages 1 - 3, XP093097369, [retrieved on 20231102]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3382284 A1 20181003; EP 3382284 B1 20220511; ES 2684128 A1 20181001; ES 2684128 B1 20190729
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 18162006 A 20180315; ES 201730490 A 20170330