EP 3431877 A1 20190123 - GAS TURBINE PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY
Title (en)
GAS TURBINE PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY
Title (de)
GASTURBINENANLAGE ZUR ERZEUGUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE
Title (fr)
INSTALLATION DE TURBINE À GAZ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
IT 201700081329 A 20170718
Abstract (en)
A gas turbine plant for the production of electrical energy is provided with at least one combustor (4) comprising a combustion chamber (20) in which, in use, combustion occurs, and with at least one burner assembly (22) facing the combustion chamber (20) and fed with a mixture of air and gas; a radio-frequency electromagnetic radiation source (11) configured to selectively irradiate the combustion chamber (20) with radio-frequency electromagnetic radiations having a given frequency (F) and a given amplitude (A); at least one detecting sensor (13) configured to detect at least one parameter indicative of the presence of flame instability phenomena inside the combustion chamber (20); and at least one control device (12) configured to selectively activate the electromagnetic radiation source (11) and regulate the frequency (F) and/or the amplitude (A) of the radio-frequency electromagnetic radiations irradiated by the electromagnetic radiation source (11) on the basis of the data detected by the at least one detecting sensor (13).
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: CN EP)
F23C 99/001 (2013.01 - CN); F23N 5/242 (2013.01 - EP); F23N 5/245 (2013.01 - EP); F23R 3/16 (2013.01 - CN); F05D 2260/964 (2013.01 - EP); F05D 2270/08 (2013.01 - EP); F23R 2900/00013 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [I] ANDREA DI VITA: "On Rayleigh's criterion of thermo-acoustics", 21 March 2016 (2016-03-21), Genova, pages 234 - 272, XP055463118, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Andrea_Di_Vita/publication/304495257_On_Rayleigh%27s_criterion_on_thermo-acoustics_-_A_Di_Vita%27s_PhD_thesis/links/5771400308ae842225ac0e23/On-Rayleighs-criterion-on-thermo-acoustics-A-Di-Vitas-PhD-thesis.pdf> [retrieved on 20180327]
- [I] EMANUEL STOCKMAN ET AL: "Pulsed Microwave Enhancement of Laminar and Turbulent Hydrocarbon Flames", 45TH AIAA AEROSPACE SCIENCES MEETING AND EXHIBIT, 8 January 2007 (2007-01-08), Reston, Virigina, XP055463312, ISBN: 978-1-62410-012-3, DOI: 10.2514/6.2007-1348
- [IA] ANDREAS EHN ET AL: "Setup for microwave stimulation of a turbulent low-swirl flame", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING LTD, GB, vol. 49, no. 18, 8 April 2016 (2016-04-08), pages 185601, XP020303716, ISSN: 0022-3727, [retrieved on 20160408], DOI: 10.1088/0022-3727/49/18/185601
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3431877 A1 20190123; EP 3431877 B1 20210428; CN 109268875 A 20190125; CN 109268875 B 20210817; IT 201700081329 A1 20190118
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 18184118 A 20180718; CN 201810790713 A 20180718; IT 201700081329 A 20170718