EP 3440595 A4 20191204 - WASTE IDENTIFICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS
Title (en)
WASTE IDENTIFICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS
Title (de)
SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABFALLIDENTIFIZIERUNG
Title (fr)
SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION DE DÉCHETS
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201615092598 A 20160406
- US 2017026095 W 20170405
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2017176855A1] In certain embodiments, a system may include an interface configured to couple to a network, at least one optical sensor configured to capture optical data associated with packaging of a waste product, and a processor coupled to the interface and to the at least one optical sensor. The processor may be configured to search at least one data source to automatically identify the waste product based on the optical data and, when the waste product is not automatically identified based on its packaging, send an alert including the optical data to a social media website through the network to solicit identifying information from one or more subscribers.
IPC 8 full level
B07C 5/342 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
B07C 5/342 (2013.01 - EP KR US); G06F 18/40 (2023.01 - EP KR); B07C 2501/0054 (2013.01 - KR); G06V 2201/06 (2022.01 - EP KR); Y02W 90/00 (2015.05 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [E] EP 3389879 A1 20181024 - WASTE REPURPOSING INT INC [US]
- [Y] US 2005065820 A1 20050324 - MALLETT SCOTT R [US], et al
- [Y] ANONYMOUS: "Bringing Future Innovation to Amazon Mechanical Turk", 21 May 2015 (2015-05-21), XP055634321, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://blog.mturk.com/bringing-future-innovation-to-mechanical-turk-c67e489e0c37> [retrieved on 20191021]
- [Y] ANONYMOUS: "reCAPTCHA - Wikipedia", WIKIPEDIA.DE, 6 February 2016 (2016-02-06), XP055635392, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=ReCAPTCHA&oldid=151147123> [retrieved on 20191023]
- [Y] ANONYMOUS: "Amazon Mechanical Turk - Wikipedia", 13 March 2016 (2016-03-13), XP055387818, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Amazon_Mechanical_Turk&oldid=709823784> [retrieved on 20170704]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2017176855 A1 20171012; AU 2017246666 A1 20181025; AU 2022224862 A1 20220929; CA 3020514 A1 20171012; EP 3440595 A1 20190213; EP 3440595 A4 20191204; KR 20190031435 A 20190326
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2017026095 W 20170405; AU 2017246666 A 20170405; AU 2022224862 A 20220902; CA 3020514 A 20170405; EP 17779725 A 20170405; KR 20187032192 A 20170405