Global Patent Index - EP 3449633 A4

EP 3449633 A4 20191218 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF PALETTE MODE CODING FOR COLOUR VIDEO DATA

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS OF PALETTE MODE CODING FOR COLOUR VIDEO DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG EINER PALETTENMODUSCODIERUNG FÜR FARBVIDEODATEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE DE MODE À PALETTES POUR DONNÉES VIDÉO EN COULEURS

Publication

EP 3449633 A4 20191218 (EN)

Application

EP 17805750 A 20170526

Priority

  • US 201662342882 P 20160528
  • CN 2017086066 W 20170526

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2017206805A1] Methods and apparatus for a coding system using palette mode coding for colour video are disclosed. According to method, when the palette mode is enabled, separate coding of luma and chroma components is disabled or if separate coding of luma and chroma components, the palette mode is disabled. According to another method, when the palette mode is enabled for the current image, palette mode coding is only applied to the luma blocks and non-palette mode coding is applied to the chroma blocks. According to yet another method, palette mode coding is applied to the luma blocks using luma palettes if the palette mode is selected for the luma blocks and palette mode coding applying to the chroma blocks using chroma palettes if the palette mode is selected for the chroma blocks. According to yet another method, the scan direction for a non-square CU depends on the shape of the non-square.

IPC 8 full level

H04N 19/176 (2014.01); H04N 19/11 (2014.01); H04N 19/129 (2014.01); H04N 19/157 (2014.01); H04N 19/186 (2014.01)

CPC (source: CN EP)

H04N 19/11 (2014.11 - CN EP); H04N 19/129 (2014.11 - CN EP); H04N 19/157 (2014.11 - CN EP); H04N 19/176 (2014.11 - CN EP); H04N 19/186 (2014.11 - CN EP); H04N 19/70 (2014.11 - CN); H04N 19/96 (2014.11 - CN); H04N 19/119 (2014.11 - CN EP)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] LI X: "Report of BoG on JEM software and SCC tools", 3. JVET MEETING; 26-5-2016 - 1-6-2016; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, no. JVET-C0100, 27 May 2016 (2016-05-27), XP030150211
  • [YP] PU WEI ET AL: "Palette Mode Coding in HEVC Screen Content Coding Extension", IEEE JOURNAL ON EMERGING AND SELECTED TOPICS IN CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 6, no. 4, 1 December 2016 (2016-12-01), pages 420 - 432, XP011636932, ISSN: 2156-3357, [retrieved on 20161212], DOI: 10.1109/JETCAS.2016.2605661
  • [Y] Y-C SUN ET AL: "AHG10: A triplet palette mode combining JCTVC-P0108 and JCTVC-P0198", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, no. JCTVC-Q0083-v3, 27 March 2014 (2014-03-27), XP030115988
  • [YP] ZHANG L ET AL: "Multiple Direct Modes for chroma intra coding", 4. JVET MEETING; 15-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, no. JVET-D0111, 6 October 2016 (2016-10-06), XP030150356
  • [A] MEDIATEK INC: "Block partitioning structure for next generation video coding", ITU-T SG16 MEETING; 12-10-2015 - 23-10-2015; GENEVA,, no. T13-SG16-C-0966, 28 September 2015 (2015-09-28), XP030100738
  • See also references of WO 2017206805A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2017206805 A1 20171207; CN 109479137 A 20190315; CN 109479137 B 20210921; CN 113727109 A 20211130; EP 3449633 A1 20190306; EP 3449633 A4 20191218; EP 3731527 A1 20201028; EP 3731527 B1 20221019; TW 201811043 A 20180316; TW I672943 B 20190921

DOCDB simple family (application)

CN 2017086066 W 20170526; CN 201780030882 A 20170526; CN 202110768355 A 20170526; EP 17805750 A 20170526; EP 20180787 A 20170526; TW 106117842 A 20170531