EP 3486806 A1 20190522 - SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS
Title (en)
SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS
Title (de)
SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES
Publication
Application
Priority
- CN 200910150720 A 20090624
- EP 10791249 A 20100422
- CN 2010072029 W 20100422
Abstract (en)
The present invention discloses a signal processing method and a data processing method and apparatus. A time-domain to frequency-domain signal processing method includes: pre-processing time-domain data; pre-rotating the pre-processed data by using a rotation factor a W N n + 0.5 ; performing a discrete Fourier transform (DFT) of N/4 points on the pre-rotated data; and post-rotating the data transformed by the DFT by using a rotation factor b W N k + 0.5 to obtain frequency-domain data. A frequency-domain to time-domain signal processing method includes: twiddling frequency-domain data; pre-rotating the twiddled data by using a rotation factor c W N k + 0.5 ; performing a DFT of N/4 points on the pre-rotated data; and post-rotating the data transformed by the DFT by using a rotation factor d W N n + 0.5 ; and post-processing the post-rotated data to obtain time-domain data. The present invention increases the efficiency of signal processing.
IPC 8 full level
G06F 17/14 (2006.01); G10L 19/02 (2013.01); H04L 12/66 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
G06F 17/14 (2013.01 - KR); G06F 17/144 (2013.01 - EP US); G06F 17/147 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 19/02 (2013.01 - KR); G10L 19/0212 (2013.01 - EP US); H03M 7/30 (2013.01 - KR); H04L 12/66 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [I] C. BURRUS ET AL: "An in-place, in-order prime factor FFT algorithm", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING., vol. 29, no. 4, August 1981 (1981-08-01), USA, pages 806 - 817, XP055581795, ISSN: 0096-3518, DOI: 10.1109/TASSP.1981.1163645
- [A] SHOUSHENG HE ET AL: "Designing pipeline FFT processor for OFDM (de)modulation", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND ELECTRONICS, 1998. ISSSE 98. 1998 URSI INTERNATI ONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PISA, ITALY 29 SEPT.-2 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, 29 September 1998 (1998-09-29), pages 257 - 262, XP010316813, ISBN: 978-0-7803-4900-1, DOI: 10.1109/ISSSE.1998.738077
- [I] SIDNEY BURRUS C: "Index Mappings for Multidimensional Formulation of the DFT and Convolution", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, USA, vol. ASSP-25, no. 3, June 1977 (1977-06-01), pages 239 - 242, XP002474298, ISSN: 0096-3518
- [I] TEMPERTON ET AL: "Implementation of a self-sorting in-place prime factor FFT algorithm", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL PHYSICS, LONDON, GB, vol. 58, no. 3, 15 May 1985 (1985-05-15), pages 283 - 299, XP024751377, ISSN: 0021-9991, [retrieved on 19850515], DOI: 10.1016/0021-9991(85)90164-0
- [I] DUHAMEL P ET AL: "Fast fourier transforms: A tutorial review and a state of the art", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, no. 4, April 1990 (1990-04-01), pages 259 - 299, XP026671916, ISSN: 0165-1684, [retrieved on 19900401], DOI: 10.1016/0165-1684(90)90158-U
- [I] SHUNI CHU ET AL: "A prime factor FTT algorithm using distributed arithmetic", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING., vol. 30, no. 2, April 1982 (1982-04-01), USA, pages 217 - 227, XP055581803, ISSN: 0096-3518, DOI: 10.1109/TASSP.1982.1163875
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA ME RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2290938 A1 20110302; EP 2290938 A4 20150121; EP 2290938 B1 20180905; CN 101930425 A 20101229; CN 101930425 B 20150930; CN 101930426 A 20101229; CN 101930426 B 20150805; EP 3486806 A1 20190522; JP 2012527708 A 20121108; JP 2013229050 A 20131107; JP 5599874 B2 20141001; JP 5708720 B2 20150430; KR 101202729 B1 20121121; KR 20110131224 A 20111206; US 2011090993 A1 20110421; US 2011185001 A1 20110728; US 8145695 B2 20120327; US 8554818 B2 20131008; WO 2010148743 A1 20101229
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 10791249 A 20100422; CN 200910150720 A 20090624; CN 2010072029 W 20100422; CN 201010213499 A 20090624; EP 18183067 A 20100422; JP 2012512184 A 20100422; JP 2013138662 A 20130702; KR 20117022261 A 20100422; US 201113086183 A 20110413; US 98000110 A 20101228