EP 3599139 B1 20210630 - MOVABLE PORTAL WASHING PROCESS AND SYSTEM
Title (en)
MOVABLE PORTAL WASHING PROCESS AND SYSTEM
Title (de)
VERFAHRBARES PORTAL WASCHVERFAHREN UND WASCHSYSTEM
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE À PORTIQUE MOBILE
Publication
Application
Priority
IT 201800007494 A 20180725
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP3599139A1] Washing system (1) of a vehicle (2) comprising a control unit (3), a platform having a longitudinal translation guide (4), a portal (5) mounted translatably along said guide (4) for the passage on the vehicle (2), said portal (5) comprising at least two diametrically opposite uprights (6a, 6b) connected by at least one cross member (7), at least two support means (8a, 8b) supported by said cross member (7) slidably along said cross member (7), at least two brushes (9a, 9b) each rotating around a corresponding rotation axis (10a, 10b) hinged in aerial suspension on a corresponding support means (8a, 8b), locking means (11a, 11b) of the orientation of each rotation axis (10a, 10b) of said brushes (9a, 9b), detection means of the washing pressure exerted by the brushes (9a, 9b) on the vehicle (2), characterized in that said control unit (3) is programmed with at least one first washing programme part that: drives the portal (5) from a first position to a second position on the guide (4), passing the portal (5) over the vehicle (2), deactivates said locking means (11a, 11b) leaving said brushes free to oscillate (9a, 9b) so as to adapt dynamically to the shape of the sides of the vehicle (2) during said passage, commands the detection of the current value of the washing pressure of the sides of the vehicle (2) during said passage, compares said current value of the washing pressure with a threshold value during said passage, commands the reciprocal movement of said support means (8a, 8b) so as to maintain during said passage the current value of the washing pressure equal to said threshold value.
IPC 8 full level
B60S 3/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B60S 3/063 (2013.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG
- DE 102014112388 A1 20160303 - WASHTEC HOLDING GMBH [DE]
- DE 19524748 A1 19970109 - WESUMAT GMBH [DE]
- JP 3066420 B2 20000717
- GB 2225561 A 19900606 - WILCOMATIC LIMITED [GB]
- WO 2016030218 A1 20160303 - WASHTEC HOLDING GMBH [DE]
- DE 29814758 U1 19991223 - CALIFORNIA KLEINDIENST HOLDING [DE]
- EP 1795408 A2 20070613 - CHRIST OTTO AG [DE]
- ANONYM: "KRAFTVOLL GEGEN SCHMUTZ, SANFT ZUM FAHRZEUG Portalwaschanlagen, mit denen Sie flexibel, schnell und sparsam waschen", KÄRCHER, KÄRCHER, 1 March 2017 (2017-03-01), pages 1 - 20, XP055912027
- ANONYM: "Kärcher CB 3/23 CB 3/25 CB 3/28 Betriebsanleitung", KÄRCHER, 1 January 2017 (2017-01-01), pages 1 - 29, XP055912020
- ANONYM: "Kärcher CB3 Servicehandbuch Displaymenü Hauptplatine", KÄRCHER, 1 March 2017 (2017-03-01), pages 1 - 103, XP055912009
- ANONYM: "Kärcher Service Handbuch CB 1/23, CB 2/23CB 1/25, CB 2/25CB 1/28, CB 2/28", 1 June 2006 (2006-06-01), pages 1 - 10, XP055912003
Opponent : WashTec Holding GmbH
- EP 1795408 B1 20120118 - CHRIST OTTO AG [DE]
- DE 102014112388 A1 20160303 - WASHTEC HOLDING GMBH [DE]
- GB 1333398 A 19731010 - CECCATO & CO
- ES 2553157 A1 20151204 - ISTOBAL SA [ES]
- WO 2016172397 A1 20161027 - BELANGER INC [US]
- DE 2238210 A1 19740214 - CHRIST & CO O
- JP 3066420 B2 20000717
- GB 2225561 A 19900606 - WILCOMATIC LIMITED [GB]
- JP H11129873 A 19990518 - TAKEUCHI IRON WORKS CORP
- DE 19524748 A1 19970109 - WESUMAT GMBH [DE]
- GUNTER GEHRKE: "der autowaschmarkt und seine entwicklung", AUTOWASCHTECHNIK: GRUNDLAGEN, VERFAHREN, ANLAGENTYPEN, VERL. MODERNE INDUSTRIE, vol. 174, 1998, XP055913212
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3599139 A1 20200129; EP 3599139 B1 20210630; IT 201800007494 A1 20200125
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 19188384 A 20190725; IT 201800007494 A 20180725