EP 3628753 A1 20200401 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING IRON- AND CHROME-CONTAINING PELLETS
Title (en)
PROCESS FOR PREPARING IRON- AND CHROME-CONTAINING PELLETS
Title (de)
VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EISEN- UND CHROMHALTIGEN PELLETS
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ POUR PRÉPARER DES PASTILLES CONTENANT DU FER ET DU CHROME
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 18196811 A 20180926
Abstract (en)
The invention provides a process for preparing iron- and chrome-containing pellets comprising the stepsa) producing ore pellets comprising mixing chrome ore material, Chrome Ore Process Residue (COPR) with less than 3 % of a carbonaceous reductant components selected from anthracite, char, coke and bituminous coal,b) optionally drying the ore pellets obtained after step a), andc) calcining the ore pellets,as well as novel iron- and chrome-containing pellets obtainable by said process.
IPC 8 full level
C22B 1/24 (2006.01); C22B 1/243 (2006.01); C22C 35/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C22B 1/2406 (2013.01); C22B 1/243 (2013.01); C22C 35/005 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- ZA 200403429 B 20051130 - XSTRATA SOUTH AFRICA PTY LTD
- WO 2014006196 A1 20140109 - LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]
- WO 2016074878 A1 20160519 - LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]
- MINERALS ENGINEERING, vol. 34, 2012, pages 55 - 62
Citation (search report)
- [XA] US 3816095 A 19740611 - BRUEN C, et al
- [A] WO 2010103343 A1 20100916 - TATA STEEL KZN PTY LTD [IN], et al
- [XAI] DWARAPUDI ET AL: "Development of Cold Bonded Chromite Pellets for Ferrochrome Production in Submerged Arc Furnace", ISIJ INTERNATIONAL,, vol. 53, no. 1, 1 January 2013 (2013-01-01), pages 9 - 17, XP002773408, DOI: 10.2355/ISIJINTERNATIONAL.53.9
- [XA] TATHAVADKAR V D ET AL: "The soda-ash roasting of chromite minerals: Kinetics considerations", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS B, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, vol. 32, no. 4, 1 August 2001 (2001-08-01), pages 593 - 602, XP019697245, ISSN: 1543-1916
- [XAI] SINGH V ET AL: "Study the effect of chromite ore properties on pelletisation process", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MINERAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 88, no. 1-2, 1 August 2008 (2008-08-01), pages 13 - 17, XP023440242, ISSN: 0301-7516, [retrieved on 20080422], DOI: 10.1016/J.MINPRO.2008.04.003
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3628753 A1 20200401; EP 3628753 B1 20220504; ES 2923938 T3 20221003; PL 3628753 T3 20220912; WO 2020064587 A1 20200402
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 18196811 A 20180926; EP 2019075450 W 20190923; ES 18196811 T 20180926; PL 18196811 T 20180926