EP 3666516 B1 20220126 - FLUID CONDUIT FOR GUIDING A FLUID
Title (en)
FLUID CONDUIT FOR GUIDING A FLUID
Title (de)
FLUIDLEITUNG ZUM LEITEN EINES FLUIDS
Title (fr)
CONDUITE DESTINÉE À CONDUIRE UN FLUIDE
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 102018131917 A 20181212
IPC 8 full level
B32B 1/08 (2006.01); B32B 25/04 (2006.01); B32B 25/14 (2006.01); C08L 23/16 (2006.01); F16L 11/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B32B 1/08 (2013.01); B32B 25/04 (2013.01); B32B 25/14 (2013.01); C08L 23/12 (2013.01); F16L 11/04 (2013.01); B32B 2307/7265 (2013.01); B32B 2597/00 (2013.01); B32B 2605/08 (2013.01); F16L 2011/047 (2013.01)
C-Set (source: EP)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : VOSS Automotive GmbH
- EP 2358811 B1 20160810 - EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al
- DE 102009051503 A1 20110505 - VERITAS AG [DE]
Opponent : Voss Automotive GmbH
- WO 2012146441 A1 20121101 - CONTITECH MGW GMBH [DE], et al
- DE 102010000180 A1 20110728 - CONTITECH SCHLAUCH GMBH [DE]
- DE 102009060065 A1 20110630 - VERITAS AG [DE]
- DE 102013103759 A1 20141016 - CONTITECH MGW GMBH [DE]
- EP 3272790 A1 20180124 - MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]
- DE 19655417 B4 20081120 - YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]
- WO 2007149155 A1 20071227 - ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US], et al
- EP 3205493 A1 20170816 - VERITAS AG [DE]
- WO 2009040610 A1 20090402 - FITT SPA [IT], et al
- US 2004058110 A1 20040325 - BHATTACHARYYA JAYANTA [US]
- CN 104235531 A 20141224 - LU ZIWAN, et al
- CN 204300539 U 20150429 - LU ZIWAN, et al
- EP 1090743 A2 20010411 - AVON PROPERTY MAN CO [US]
- US 3862106 A 19750121 - FISCHER WILLIAM K
- EP 1897912 A1 20080312 - LANXESS INC [CA]
- EP 1878961 B1 20090805 - VERITAS AG [DE]
- FALBE JÜRGEN, ET AL.: "Thermoplastische Elasto-mere", RÖMPP CHEMIE LEXIKON, vol. 6, 1 January 1995 (1995-01-01), pages 4572, XP055978580
- ANONYMOUS: "Thermoplastische Vulkanisate", WIKIPEDIA, 21 June 2015 (2015-06-21), XP055978584, [retrieved on 20221107]
- ANONYMOUS: "Santoprene", WIKIPEDIA, 1 January 2016 (2016-01-01), XP055978586, [retrieved on 20221107]
- BHATTACHARYA BARAN ASIT, ET AL.: "Automotive applications of thermoplastic vulcanizates", J. APPL. POLYM SCI., vol. 137, 1 January 2020 (2020-01-01), pages e49181, XP055978592
- KURZIDIM FABIAN: "Prozess und Materialeigenschaften bei der Herstellung von Thermoplastischen Vulkanisaten im Zweischneckenextruder", DISSERTATION, 13 August 2014 (2014-08-13), XP055978595, [retrieved on 20221107]
- KINSUK NASKAR: "Dynamically vulcanized PP/EPDM thermoplastic elastomers: exploring novel routes for crosslinking with peroxides", UNIVERSITY OF TWENTE, 11 June 2004 (2004-06-11), XP055762345, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://ris.utwente.nl/ws/files/6071313/thesis_Naskar.pdf>
- ABDOU-SABET S, ET AL.: "Dynamically Vulcanized Thermoplastic Elastomers", RUBBER CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 69, no. 3, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), XP055978600
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3666516 A1 20200617; EP 3666516 B1 20220126; DE 102018131917 A1 20200618; ES 2909494 T3 20220506
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 19213053 A 20191203; DE 102018131917 A 20181212; ES 19213053 T 20191203