EP 3733015 A1 20201104 - REFLECTIVE JEWELRY ARTICLE
Title (en)
REFLECTIVE JEWELRY ARTICLE
Title (de)
REFLEKTIERENDER SCHMUCKARTIKEL
Title (fr)
ARTICLE DE BIJOUTERIE RÉFLÉCHISSANT
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 19171771 A 20190430
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a reflective ring or bracelet (10; 20) comprising at least one continuous reflective freeform surface (12; 22) configured to reflect light rays to a projection surface (30). The at least one continuous reflective freeform surface (12; 22) comprises a predetermined 3D pattern for projecting a predetermined image on the projection surface (30). The invention also relates to a method of manufacturing the reflective ring or bracelet (10; 20), comprising: i) providing a black and white image of the image to be displayed on the projecting surface (30), ii) using a computer algorithm to calculate the shape of the predetermined 3D pattern of said at least one continuous reflective freeform surface (12; 22), iii) generating a 3D surface in industry standard CAD format based on the predetermined 3D pattern, iv) providing a blank ring or bracelet, and v) reproducing the 3D surface on the blank ring or bracelet.
IPC 8 full level
A44C 5/00 (2006.01); A44C 9/00 (2006.01); A44C 15/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A44C 5/0015 (2013.01); A44C 9/0053 (2013.01); A44C 15/0015 (2013.01); A44C 15/004 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 9188783 B2 20151117 - PAPAS MARIOS [CH], et al
- EP 2963463 A1 20160106 - ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE EPFL [CH]
Citation (search report)
- [XI] WO 2019063778 A1 20190404 - SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]
- [XI] EP 3187343 A1 20170705 - MASTER DYNAMIC LTD [CN]
- [XI] RAYFORM: "Rayform", YOUTUBE, 13 June 2016 (2016-06-13), pages 1 - 3, XP054979706, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=IqrsptUdxHs> [retrieved on 20190919]
- [XI] RAYFORM: "Rayform, bracelet with nearly flat surface that reflects light as an image due to caustic effect", 14 September 2018 (2018-09-14), Facebook.com, XP055623655, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.facebook.com/RayformSA/> [retrieved on 20190918]
- [XI] LYNETTE GRODSKIY: "Material Insight: Rayform - Material ConneXion (Reflecting light image materials)", 29 April 2019 (2019-04-29), XP055623581, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.materialconnexion.com/material-insight-rayform/> [retrieved on 20190918]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 19171771 A 20190430; IB 2020054017 W 20200429