EP 3784764 B1 20230607 - AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR DISSOLVING HAIR AND CORRESPONDING USES AND METHODS
Title (en)
AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR DISSOLVING HAIR AND CORRESPONDING USES AND METHODS
Title (de)
WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM AUFLÖSEN VON HAAREN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE VERWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION AQUEUSE POUR DISSOUDRE DES POILS AINSI QU'UTILISATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANTS
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 102018110284 A 20180427
- EP 2019057492 W 20190326
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2019206544A1] The present invention relates to an aqueous composition for dissolving hair, which comprises one or more thioglycolates and urea. The invention further relates to the use of a claimed aqueous composition for dissolving hair and/or as a tube or drain cleaner. The invention further relates to a method for dissolving hair.
IPC 8 full level
C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/34 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C11D 3/323 (2013.01); C11D 3/3427 (2013.01); C11D 7/3272 (2013.01); C11D 7/34 (2013.01); C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 7/06 (2013.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Caroline Bley
- WO 2017122020 A1 20170720 - RECKITT BENCKISER (BRANDS) LTD [GB]
- US 4587032 A 19860506 - ROGERS THOMAS A [US]
- HARRAP BS, GILLESPIE JM: "A Further Study on the Extraction of Reduced Proteins From Wool", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, C.S.I.R.O., MELBOURNE, AU, vol. 16, no. 2, 1 January 1963 (1963-01-01), AU , pages 542, XP093185764, ISSN: 0004-9417, DOI: 10.1071/BI9630542
- ANONYMOUS: "MR MUSCLE Drain Cleaner - SAFETY DATA SHEET (Version 1.0)", JOHNSON, 4 June 2014 (2014-06-04), XP093185766
- ANONYMOUS: "DRANO® MAX BUILD UP REMOVER COMMERCIAL LINE™ - Safety Data Sheet (Version 1.0)", JOHNSON, 4 February 2015 (2015-02-04), XP093185769, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://sds.staples.com/msds/24558796.pdf>
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2019206544 A1 20191031; DE 102018110284 A1 20191031; EP 3784764 A1 20210303; EP 3784764 B1 20230607; EP 3784764 C0 20230607; ES 2949788 T3 20231003; PL 3784764 T3 20231002
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2019057492 W 20190326; DE 102018110284 A 20180427; EP 19713777 A 20190326; ES 19713777 T 20190326; PL 19713777 T 20190326