EP 3813533 A4 20210519 - A FUNCTIONAL BREADSTICK
Title (en)
A FUNCTIONAL BREADSTICK
Title (de)
FUNKTIONELLER BROTSTICK
Title (fr)
GRESSIN FONCTIONNEL
Publication
Application
Priority
- TR 201809021 A 20180626
- TR 2019050386 W 20190528
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2020040712A2] The present invention is a functional breadstick, characterized in that said functional breadstick comprises resistant starch between 10% and 40% by weight and inuline between 5% and 10% by weight.
IPC 8 full level
A21D 13/06 (2017.01); A23L 33/21 (2016.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A21D 2/181 (2013.01); A21D 2/186 (2013.01); A21D 2/36 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] CN 106720124 A 20170531 - HENAN KANGYIYUAN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD
- [A] CN 108174900 A 20180619 - SILANG FOODS HUAIBEI CO LTD
- [A] WO 2009135959 A1 20091112 - KATRY INVERSIONES S L [ES], et al
- [A] CN 106982883 A 20170728 - SHANGHAI YUEZHE FOOD CO LTD
- [A] WO 2008115046 A1 20080925 - NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al
- [Y] KHAN A ET AL: "Cinnamon Improves Glucose and Lipids of People with Type 2 Diabetes", DIABETES CARE, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, ALEXANDRIA, VA, US, vol. 26, no. 12, 1 December 2003 (2003-12-01), pages 3215 - 3218, XP002368461, ISSN: 0149-5992
- [Y] HLEBOWICZ JOANNA ET AL: "Effect of cinnamon on postprandial blood glucose, gastric emptying, and satiety in healthy subjects", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION,, vol. 85, no. 6, 1 June 2007 (2007-06-01), pages 1552 - 1556, XP002609982, ISSN: 0002-9165
- [Y] WICKENBERG JENNIE ET AL: "Effects of Curcuma longa (turmeric) on postprandial plasma glucose and insulin in healthy subjects", NUTRITION JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, vol. 9, no. 1, 12 October 2010 (2010-10-12), pages 43, XP021077645, ISSN: 1475-2891, DOI: 10.1186/1475-2891-9-43
- [Y] GHORBANI ZEINAB ET AL: "Anti-Hyperglycemic and Insulin Sensitizer Effects of Turmeric and Its Principle Constituent Curcumin", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM, vol. 12, no. 4, 1 October 2014 (2014-10-01), XP055777055, ISSN: 1726-913X, DOI: 10.5812/ijem.18081
- [Y] WICKENBERG JENNIE O: "Investigations into the Effects of Turmeric, Cinnamon and Green Tea on Glycaemic Control and Liver Enzymes", 20 February 2015 (2015-02-20), XP055777056, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://lup.lub.lu.se/search/ws/files/4081512/5031864.pdf> [retrieved on 20210217]
- See references of WO 2020040712A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2020040712 A2 20200227; WO 2020040712 A3 20200423; EP 3813533 A2 20210505; EP 3813533 A4 20210519
DOCDB simple family (application)
TR 2019050386 W 20190528; EP 19851229 A 20190528