EP 3824603 A4 20220504 - HIGH PERFORMANCE SOFTWARE-DEFINED CORE NETWORK
Title (en)
HIGH PERFORMANCE SOFTWARE-DEFINED CORE NETWORK
Title (de)
HOCHLEISTUNGSSOFTWAREDEFINIERTES KERNNETZWERK
Title (fr)
RÉSEAU CENTRAL DÉFINI PAR LOGICIEL HAUTE PERFORMANCE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201862700137 P 20180718
- US 201862745548 P 20181015
- US 201816164457 A 20181018
- US 201816189735 A 20181113
- US 201816188740 A 20181113
- US 201816207155 A 20181202
- US 201816207156 A 20181202
- US 201816227967 A 20181220
- US 201816227949 A 20181220
- US 201816231529 A 20181223
- US 201816231530 A 20181223
- US 201816231527 A 20181223
- US 201816231532 A 20181223
- US 201916378757 A 20190409
- US 201916378771 A 20190409
- US 201916378712 A 20190409
- US 201916378689 A 20190409
- US 2019042261 W 20190717
IPC 8 full level
H04L 45/30 (2022.01); H04L 41/0806 (2022.01); H04L 41/0823 (2022.01); H04L 45/12 (2022.01); H04L 45/24 (2022.01); H04L 45/586 (2022.01); H04L 45/64 (2022.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04L 41/0806 (2013.01); H04L 41/0823 (2013.01); H04L 41/0895 (2022.05); H04L 41/122 (2022.05); H04L 41/40 (2022.05); H04L 45/12 (2013.01); H04L 45/123 (2013.01); H04L 45/124 (2013.01); H04L 45/24 (2013.01); H04L 45/30 (2013.01); H04L 45/586 (2013.01); H04L 45/64 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] JP 2010233126 A 20101014 - NEC CORP
- [XA] US 2010290422 A1 20101118 - HAIGH RONALD E [US], et al
- [XA] FRANCOIS FREDERIC ET AL: "Optimizing Secure SDN-Enabled Inter-Data Centre Overlay Networks through Cognitive Routing", 2016 IEEE 24TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF COMPUTER AND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS (MASCOTS), IEEE, 19 September 2016 (2016-09-19), pages 283 - 288, XP033018506, DOI: 10.1109/MASCOTS.2016.26
- [A] BAROZET ET AL: "Cisco SDWAN/NFV Technical Marketing Deep Dive", 1 December 2017 (2017-12-01), XP055735816, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.coursehero.com/file/71671376/Cisco-SDWAN-Deep-Divepdf/>
- [A] ZHENHAI DUAN ET AL: "Service overlay networks", IEEE /ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE / ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 11, no. 6, 1 December 2003 (2003-12-01), pages 870 - 883, XP058383207, ISSN: 1063-6692, DOI: 10.1109/TNET.2003.820436
- See also references of WO 2020018704A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 19838906 A 20190717