EP 3867393 A4 20220824 - ENZYMATIC PRODUCTION OF TAGATOSE
Title (en)
ENZYMATIC PRODUCTION OF TAGATOSE
Title (de)
ENZYMATISCHE HERSTELLUNG VON TAGATOSE
Title (fr)
PRODUCTION ENZYMATIQUE DE TAGATOSE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201862747877 P 20181019
- US 201962790788 P 20190110
- US 2019056978 W 20191018
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2020081959A1] Disclosed herein are improved processes for making tagatose including the steps of converting F6P to T6P, catalyzed by a F6PE; and converting the T6P to tagatose, catalyzed by a T6PP, using enzymes with higher activities compared to F6PEs and T6PPs previously used in a process to produce tagatose.
IPC 8 full level
C12P 19/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/90 (2006.01); C12P 19/24 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
C12N 9/1051 (2013.01 - KR); C12N 9/90 (2013.01 - EP KR); C12N 15/52 (2013.01 - EP); C12P 19/02 (2013.01 - EP KR US); C12P 19/24 (2013.01 - EP KR US); C12Y 204/01001 (2013.01 - KR); C12Y 204/01018 (2013.01 - KR); C12Y 501/03 (2013.01 - EP KR); C12Y 503/01009 (2013.01 - KR); C12Y 504/02002 (2013.01 - EP KR); C12Y 207/01144 (2013.01 - US); C12Y 503/01009 (2013.01 - US); C12Y 504/02002 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 2018182344 A1 20181004 - CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR] & DATABASE Geneseq [online] 29 November 2018 (2018-11-29), "Thermanaerothrix daxensis fructose-6-phosphate C4 epimerase, SEQ ID 9.", XP055941030, retrieved from EBI accession no. GSP:BFS42658 Database accession no. BFS42658
- [XDA] WO 2017059278 A1 20170406 - BONUMOSE BIOCHEM LLC [US]
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 25 October 2017 (2017-10-25), "Tagatose-bisphosphate aldolase", XP055941039, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:A0A223HVJ3 Database accession no. A0A223HVJ3
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 25 April 2018 (2018-04-25), "Tagatose-bisphosphate aldolase", XP055941050, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:A0A2M8QBR9 Database accession no. A0A2M8QBR9
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 24 June 2015 (2015-06-24), "Beta-phosphoglucomutase", XP055941055, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:A0A0E3NCH4 Database accession no. A0A0E3NCH4
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 10 August 2010 (2010-08-10), "HAD-superfamily hydrolase, subfamily IA, variant 3", XP055941056, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:D6YBK5 Database accession no. D6YBK5
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 2 November 2010 (2010-11-02), "GS1-like protein {ECO:0000313|EMBL:ADN02366.1};", XP055941058, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:E0RT70 Database accession no. E0RT70
- [A] DATABASE UniProt [online] 19 January 2010 (2010-01-19), "HAD-superfamily hydrolase, subfamily IA, variant 3", XP002807050, retrieved from EBI accession no. UNIPROT:D1C7G9 Database accession no. D1C7G9
- See also references of WO 2020081959A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2020081959 A1 20200423; AU 2019362044 A1 20210520; BR 112021007438 A2 20210810; CA 3117105 A1 20200423; CN 113366112 A 20210907; EP 3867393 A1 20210825; EP 3867393 A4 20220824; JP 2022512728 A 20220207; JP 2024075570 A 20240604; KR 20210096084 A 20210804; MA 53928 A 20220126; MX 2021004035 A 20210910; US 2021388404 A1 20211216
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2019056978 W 20191018; AU 2019362044 A 20191018; BR 112021007438 A 20191018; CA 3117105 A 20191018; CN 201980084028 A 20191018; EP 19872722 A 20191018; JP 2021521105 A 20191018; JP 2024026360 A 20240226; KR 20217014631 A 20191018; MA 53928 A 20191018; MX 2021004035 A 20191018; US 201917284838 A 20191018