EP 3871459 A4 20220713 - SOFT RESOURCE SIGNALING IN INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL (IAB) NETWORKS
Title (en)
SOFT RESOURCE SIGNALING IN INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL (IAB) NETWORKS
Title (de)
WEICHE RESSOURCENSIGNALISIERUNG IN INTEGRIERTEN ZUGANGS- UND BACKHAUL (IAB)-NETZEN
Title (fr)
SIGNALISATION NON STRICTE DE RESSOURCES DANS DES RÉSEAUX À ACCÈS ET RACCORDEMENT INTÉGRÉS (IAB)
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201862750738 P 20181025
- US 2019056110 W 20191014
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2020086316A1] An apparatus of an Integrated Access and Backhaul (IAB) node includes processing circuitry coupled to memory. To configure the IAB node for resource assignment associated with a distributed unit (DU) child link with a child IAB node, the processing circuitry is to perform monitoring of physical downlink control channel (PDCCH) transmissions on a parent backhaul link between a mobile termination (MT) function of the IAB node and a DU function of a parent IAB node. A non-scheduled time resource for the parent backhaul link is detected based on the monitoring. Data is encoded for a downlink transmission from a DU function of the IAB node on the DU child link, the downlink transmission using the detected non-scheduled time resource.
IPC 8 full level
H04W 72/12 (2009.01); H04B 7/155 (2006.01); H04W 72/04 (2009.01); H04W 84/04 (2009.01); H04W 88/08 (2009.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04W 72/54 (2023.01); H04B 7/15542 (2013.01); H04W 72/20 (2023.01); H04W 84/047 (2013.01); H04W 88/085 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [E] EP 3648529 A1 20200506 - LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]
- [XY] NOKIA ET AL: "Resource allocation/coordination between Parent BH and Child links", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, 28 September 2018 (2018-09-28), XP051518080, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94b/Docs/R1%2D1810675%2Ezip> [retrieved on 20180928]
- [Y] QUALCOMM INCORPORATED: "Resource Management in IAB Network", vol. RAN WG1, 29 September 2018 (2018-09-29), pages 1 - 8, XP051518661, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94b/Docs/R1%2D1811258%2Ezip>
- [A] ZTE: "Overview of physical layer enhancements for IAB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korean; 20180521 - 20180525, 12 May 2018 (2018-05-12), XP051462292, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F93/Docs> [retrieved on 20180512]
- See references of WO 2020086316A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2020086316 A1 20200430; EP 3871459 A1 20210901; EP 3871459 A4 20220713
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2019056110 W 20191014; EP 19877240 A 20191014