EP 3892953 A1 20211013 - LATCH SPRING RETAINER FOR A MODULAR HANDHELD FIREARM
Title (en)
LATCH SPRING RETAINER FOR A MODULAR HANDHELD FIREARM
Title (de)
SCHLIESSFEDERAUFNAHME FÜR SCHLITTEN EINER MODULAREN HANDFEUERWAFFE
Title (fr)
LOGEMENT DE RESSORT DE FERMETURE POUR UN COULISSEAU D'UNE ARME DE POING MODULAIRE
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 20168815 A 20200408
Abstract (en)
[origin: CA3175161A1] The invention relates to a recoil-spring mount (9) for a breechblock (2) of a pistol (1), wherein the breechblock (2) has breechblock guides (7) on both sides, and the recoil-spring mount (9) is designed such that it can be inserted into the breechblock (2) and fastened, and it has a preferably substantially half-cylindrical main body (10) with at least partially continuous guide rails (11) on both sides and, on a rear side, it has a substantially circular shoulder (12) for mounting a recoil spring unit (4). The invention also relates to a modular breechblock (2) for such a recoil-spring mount (9), and also to a breechblock case (17) that can be fastened on the breechblock (2) by means of said mount, and also to the breechblock case (17) alone.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schließfederaufnahme (9) für einen Verschluss (2) einer Pistole (1), wobei der Verschluss (2) beidseitig Verschlussführungen (7) aufweist, und die Schließfederaufnahme (9) in den Verschluss (2) einführbar und befestigbar ausgebildet ist und einen, bevorzugt im Wesentlichen halbzylinderförmigen, Grundkörper (10) mit beidseitig zumindest teilweise durchgehenden Führungsschienen (11) aufweist, und an einer Rückseite einen im Wesentlichen kreisförmigen Absatz (12) zur Aufnahme einer Schließfedereinheit (4) aufweist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung einen modularen Verschluss (2)für eine derartige Schließfederaufnahme (9), sowie eine mittels dieser am Verschluss (2) befestigbare Verschlusshülle (17), sowie die Verschlusshülle (17) alleine.
IPC 8 full level
F41C 3/00 (2006.01); F41A 3/86 (2006.01); F41A 11/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP IL US)
F41A 3/66 (2013.01 - EP); F41A 3/86 (2013.01 - EP IL US); F41A 11/02 (2013.01 - EP IL US); F41C 3/00 (2013.01 - EP IL US); F41C 27/00 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (applicant)
- US 2009071053 A1 20090319 - THOMELE ADRIAN J O [DE], et al
- US 2017321980 A1 20171109 - WOLF ALEC [US]
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 2017191769 A1 20170706 - MARTINDILL T K [US], et al
- [A] GB 201958 A 19230810 - GEORGE HAZELTON
- [A] US 4031808 A 19770628 - RAVILLE CLARENCE A
Citation (third parties)
Third party : Bender
- LONEWOLFDISTRIBUTORS: "Lone Wolf: Slide Adapter Installation for Glock", YOUTUBE, 24 February 2016 (2016-02-24), XP055876527, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?app=desktop&v=zZY8aMMZdXE>
- ANONYMOUS: "Lone Wolf Slide Adapter", LONE WOLF - PRODUCT DESCRIPTION, 30 August 2018 (2018-08-30), XP055876528, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.lonewolfdist.com/PRODUCT/922564/lwdslideadapter/> [retrieved on 20220106]
Third party : anonymous
STEEP KUNTRY OUTDOORS: "Glock 1926 19/26 Hybrid Mod - No Chop!", YOUTUBE, 28 July 2016 (2016-07-28), XP055874907, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=RnNmNzuD-hw>
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 3892953 A1 20211013; EP 3892953 B1 20230705; EP 3892953 C0 20230705; BR 112022018430 A2 20221101; CA 3175161 A1 20211014; EP 4235080 A2 20230830; EP 4235080 A3 20230906; HR P20230781 T1 20231027; IL 296575 A 20221101; US 2023138874 A1 20230504; WO 2021204689 A1 20211014
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 20168815 A 20200408; BR 112022018430 A 20210401; CA 3175161 A 20210401; EP 2021058672 W 20210401; EP 23175144 A 20200408; HR P20230781 T 20200408; IL 29657522 A 20220918; US 202117995690 A 20210401