EP 3897114 A4 20220824 - COMPOSITION FOR REMOVING CRUSTACEAN ECTOPARASITES FROM FARMED SALMONID FISH USING CURCUMIN OR A PHARMACEUTICAL ACCEPTABLE DERIVATE THEREOF AND LIGHT
Title (en)
COMPOSITION FOR REMOVING CRUSTACEAN ECTOPARASITES FROM FARMED SALMONID FISH USING CURCUMIN OR A PHARMACEUTICAL ACCEPTABLE DERIVATE THEREOF AND LIGHT
Title (de)
ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON KRUSTENTIEREKTOPARASITEN AUS ZUCHTSALMONIDEN MIT CURCUMIN ODER EINEM PHARMAZEUTISCH ANNEHMBAREN DERIVAT DAVON UND LICHT
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À ÉLIMINER LES CRUSTACÉS ECTOPARASITES DES SALMONIDÉS D'ÉLEVAGE À L'AIDE DE LA CURCUMINE OU D'UN DÉRIVÉ PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CELLE-CI ET DE LA LUMIÈRE
Publication
Application
Priority
- NO 20181623 A 20181217
- NO 20190825 A 20190701
- NO 2019050279 W 20191217
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2020130843A1] Composition in the form of an aqueous solution comprising a photosensitizer for use in a method of photodynamic therapy for an external crustacean parasite infection in salmonid fish, said external crustacean parasite infection comprises an infection of salmon lice, Lepeophtheirus salmonis, Caligus rogercresseyi and Caligus spp. Said photosensitizer is curcumin or a pharmaceutical acceptable derivative thereof, and said photosensitizer is administered in a bath treatment of the salmonid fish in need of such treatment, and the salmon lice is illuminated by light.
IPC 8 full level
A01K 61/13 (2017.01); A01N 25/00 (2006.01); A01N 35/02 (2006.01); A01P 7/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/121 (2006.01)
CPC (source: DK EP NO)
A01K 61/13 (2016.12 - DK EP NO); A01K 61/60 (2016.12 - DK NO); A01K 63/04 (2013.01 - DK NO); A01K 63/06 (2013.01 - DK NO); A01N 25/00 (2013.01 - DK); A01N 25/006 (2013.01 - DK NO); A01N 27/00 (2013.01 - NO); A01N 35/02 (2013.01 - EP); A01P 7/00 (2021.08 - EP); A61K 31/12 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/724 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 36/9066 (2013.01 - NO); A61K 41/0057 (2013.01 - NO); A61N 5/06 (2013.01 - NO); A61N 5/062 (2013.01 - NO); Y02A 40/81 (2017.12 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 2531022 B1 20160511 - STINGRAY MARINE SOLUTIONS AS [NO]
- [A] JP 2005230007 A 20050902 - FUJI FLOUR MILLING
- [A] SEMERARO PAOLA ET AL: "Chlorophyllain cyclodextrin supramolecular complexes as a natural photosensitizer for photodynamic therapy (PDT) applications", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING C, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A, CH, vol. 85, 15 December 2017 (2017-12-15), pages 47 - 56, XP085415459, ISSN: 0928-4931, DOI: 10.1016/J.MSEC.2017.12.012
- [YA] H. ABRAHAMSE ET AL: "New photosensitizers for photodynamic therapy", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, vol. 473, no. 4, 15 February 2016 (2016-02-15), GB, pages 347 - 364, XP055582908, ISSN: 0264-6021, DOI: 10.1042/BJ20150942
- [YA] ROBERTSON P K J ET AL: "A new generation of biocides for control of crustacea in fish farms", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, vol. 95, no. 1, 2 April 2009 (2009-04-02), pages 58 - 63, XP025981403, ISSN: 1011-1344, [retrieved on 20090314], DOI: 10.1016/J.JPHOTOBIOL.2008.12.009
- See references of WO 2020130843A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2020130843 A1 20200625; CA 3123798 A1 20200625; CL 2021001608 A1 20220114; DK 202170358 A1 20210708; EP 3897114 A1 20211027; EP 3897114 A4 20220824; NO 20191485 A1 20200618; NO 346510 B1 20220912
DOCDB simple family (application)
NO 2019050279 W 20191217; CA 3123798 A 20191217; CL 2021001608 A 20210617; DK PA202170358 A 20210705; EP 19901125 A 20191217; NO 20191485 A 20191217